Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1721606

EP1721606 - Buffered compositions for dialysis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 27.12.2017  [2017/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Renal Technologies
40 Lake Bellevue Suite 100
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
[2013/33]
Former [2006/46]For all designated states
Advanced Renal Technologies
Suite 100, 40 Lake Bellevue
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Callan, Robin
3208 106th Avenue Southeast
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
02 / Van Schalkwijk, Walter A.
7630 139th Place NE
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
03 / Cole, James J.
19512 Jordan Road
Arlington, Washington 98223 / US
 [2013/36]
Former [2013/32]01 / Callan, Robin
3208 106th Avenue Southeast
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
02 / Van Schalkwijk, Walter A.
18305 Southeast Newport Way, Suite E-303
Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US
03 / Cole, James J.
19512 Jordan Road
Arlington, Washington 98223 / US
Former [2006/46]01 / Callan, Robin
3208 106th Avenue Southeast
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
02 / Van Schalkwijk, Walter A.
18305 Southeast Newport Way, Suit E-303
Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US
03 / Cole; James
19512 Jordan Road
Arlington, Washington 98223 / US
Representative(s)Teall, Charlotte , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2012/13]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2006/46]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date06006408.619.10.1999
[2006/46]
Priority number, dateUS1998017606320.10.1998         Original published format: US 176063
US19980105049P20.10.1998         Original published format: US 105049 P
[2006/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1721606
Date:15.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1721606
Date:17.06.2009
[2009/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1721606
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/194, A61K33/14, A61P13/12
[2006/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2006/46]
TitleGerman:Gepufferte Dialysezusammensetzungen[2006/46]
English:Buffered compositions for dialysis[2006/46]
French:Compositions tamponnées pour dialyse[2006/46]
Examination procedure28.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/46]
27.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2012Observations by third parties
20.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
06.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2012Observations by third parties
14.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
15.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2013Observations by third parties
14.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2013Observations by third parties
22.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2013Fee for grant paid
30.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99970600.5  / EP1124567
Divisional application(s)EP11190795.2  / EP2452685
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990970600) is  29.01.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014  09.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  11.06.2014  15.01.2016  WITHDRAWN
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 03  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
INTERMEDT Medizin & Technik GmbH
Gewerbestrasse Süd 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  11.06.2014  07.03.2017  WITHDRAWN
D_MED Consulting AG
Wilhelmshofallee 79-81
47800 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/28]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014  09.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  11.06.2014  15.01.2016  WITHDRAWN
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 03  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
INTERMEDT Medizin & Technik GmbH
Gewerbestrasse Süd 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  11.06.2014  07.03.2017  WITHDRAWN
D_MED Consulting AG
Wilhelmshofallee 79-81
47800 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2017/16]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014  09.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  11.06.2014  15.01.2016  WITHDRAWN
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 03  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
INTERMEDT Medizin & Technik GmbH
Gewerbestrasse Süd 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  11.06.2014  07.03.2017  WITHDRAWN
D_MED Consulting AG
Wilhelmshofallee 79-81
47800 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014  09.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  11.06.2014  15.01.2016  WITHDRAWN
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 03  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
INTERMEDT Medizin & Technik GmbH
Gewerbestrasse Süd 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D_MED Consulting AG
Wilhelmshofallee 79-81
47800 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/32]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014  09.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
INTERMEDT Medizin & Technik GmbH
Gewerbestrasse Süd 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D_MED Consulting AG
Wilhelmshofallee 79-81
47800 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/16]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014  09.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
INTERMEDT Medizin & Technik GmbH
Gewerbestrasse Süd 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D_MED Consulting AG
Wilhelmshofallee 79-81
47800 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstraße 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/30]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014  13.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 02  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care AG & Co. KGaA
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 03  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
INTERMEDT Medizin & Technik GmbH
Gewerbestrasse Süd 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstr. 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
 04  11.06.2014  16.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D_MED Consulting AG
Wilhelmshofallee 79-81
47800 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft, et al
Burgunderstr. 29
40549 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2014   
GAMBRO LUNDIA AB
Magistratsvägen 16
SE-22643 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Simons, Amanda Louise
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
17.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
03.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.08.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition31.08.2016Appeal received No.  T2015/16
05.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
LU19.10.2013
GR12.12.2013
IE19.10.2015
PT19.04.2016
AT19.10.2016
DK31.10.2016
[2017/52]
Former [2017/45]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
LU19.10.2013
GR12.12.2013
IE19.10.2015
PT19.04.2016
AT19.10.2016
Former [2016/45]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
LU19.10.2013
GR12.12.2013
IE19.10.2015
PT19.04.2016
Former [2016/38]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
LU19.10.2013
GR12.12.2013
PT19.04.2016
Former [2015/34]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
LU19.10.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/29]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
MC11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY11.09.2013
FI11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY10.07.2013
FI11.09.2013
GR12.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY10.07.2013
FI11.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY10.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0457960  (MINNTECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 5, lines 1-30 * * claim - *;
 [XY]EP0821951  (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * claim - * [Y] 2-4;
 [X]WO9601118  (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 2 * page 5, lines 14-26 *;
 [X]US5252213  (AHMAD SUHAIL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,12-18 * abstract * * column 15, line 59 - column 16, line 2 * * column 16, lines 17-25 *;
 [X]JPH0892070  ;
 [X]DE4114908  (SODEMANN KLAUS DR MED [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * claims 5,6 *;
 [Y]JPH1087478  ;
 [A]EP0022922  (GAMBRO DIALYSATOREN [DE]) [A] 1-5 * example 1 *;
 [X]JPH06335527  ;
 [X]WO9211046  (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [X] 12-18 * amended claims 4,6 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 24, Database accession no. 1996-235949, XP002504688 & JPH0892070 A 19960409 (MORISHITA ROUSSEL KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 24, Database accession no. 1998-267011, XP002504689 & JPH1087478 A 19980407 (TOMITA SEIYAKU KK) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - MEULEN VAN DER J ET AL, "CITRATE ANTICOAGULATION AND DIALYSATE WITH REDUCED BUFFER CONTENT IN CHRONIC HEMODIALYSIS", CLINICAL NEPHROLOGY, DUSTRI VERLAG, NUENCHEN-DEISENHOFEN, DE, (19920101), vol. 37, no. 1, ISSN 0301-0430, pages 36 - 41, XP000901612 [Y] 1-5 * page 37, lines 6-14 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 08, Database accession no. 1995-056931, XP002526871 & JPH06335527 A 19941206 (MORISHITA ROUSSEL KK) [X] 12-18 * abstract *
ExaminationWO9829151
 EP0457960
otherWO9829151
 US5252213
 EP0022922
 EP0457960