Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1746451

EP1746451 - Telescope with wide field of view and variable magnification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/04]Telescope with wide field of view and large magnification
[2009/46]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swarovski-Optik KG.
Swarovskistrasse 70
6060 Absam / AT
[N/P]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
Swarovski-Optik KG
Swarovskistrasse 70
6060 Absam / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Fiedler, Albert
Krippstrasse 25A
6067 Absam / AT
 [2007/04]
Representative(s)Burger, Hannes , et al
Anwälte Burger & Partner
Rechtsanwalt GmbH
Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]Burger, Hannes , et al
Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
Former [2008/09]Ofner, Clemens , et al
Dr. Lindmayr, Dr.Bauer, Dr. Secklehner Rechtsanwalts-OEG Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
Former [2007/08]Torggler, Paul Norbert , et al
Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556
6021 Innsbruck / AT
Former [2007/04]Hofinger, Engelbert , et al
Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Application number, filing date06007466.308.04.2006
[2007/04]
Priority number, dateAT2005000122020.07.2005         Original published format: AT 12202005
[2007/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1746451
Date:24.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1746451
Date:11.07.2007
[2007/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1746451
Date:09.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:G02B23/14
[2009/46]
Former International [2007/04]G02B23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/14]
Former [2008/12]
Former [2007/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL08.01.2008
BA08.01.2008
HR08.01.2008
MK08.01.2008
YU08.01.2008
TitleGerman:Fernrohr mit grossem Sehfeld und variabler Vergrösserung[2009/46]
English:Telescope with wide field of view and variable magnification[2009/46]
French:Lunette de visée à grand champ et grossissement variable[2009/46]
Former [2007/04]Fernoptische Einrichtung mit grossem Sehfeld und hoher Vergrösserung
Former [2007/04]Telescope with wide field of view and large magnification
Former [2007/04]Lunette de visée à grand champ et grossissement élevé
Examination procedure08.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/52]
10.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2010Fee for grant paid
11.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10001987.6  / EP2211222
EP19187590.5
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.2011  12.02.2019  WITHDRAWN
Leica Camera AG
Oskar-Barnack-Str. 11
35606 Solms / DE
Opponent's representative
Körfer, Thomas, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
 02  09.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Analytik Jena AG
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
7745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Oehmke, Volker, et al
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen
Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
 03  08.03.2011  17.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH
Gloelstrasse 3-5
35576 Wetzlar / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
 [2019/12]
Former [2018/43]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Leica Camera AG
Oskar-Barnack-Str. 11
35606 Solms / DE
Opponent's representative
Körfer, Thomas, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
 02  09.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Analytik Jena AG
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
7745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Oehmke, Volker, et al
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen
Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
 03  08.03.2011  17.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH
Gloelstrasse 3-5
35576 Wetzlar / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/39]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Leica Camera AG
Oskar-Barnack-Str. 11
35606 Solms / DE
Opponent's representative
Körfer, Thomas, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
 02  09.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Analytik Jena AG
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
7745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Oehmke, Volker, et al
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen
Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
 03  08.03.2011  06.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH
Gloelstrasse 3-5
35576 Wetzlar / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2013/26]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Leica Camera AG
Oskar-Barnack-Str. 11
35606 Solms / DE
Opponent's representative
Körfer, Thomas, et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
 02  09.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Analytik Jena AG
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
7745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Oehmke, Volker, et al
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
 03  08.03.2011  06.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH
Gloelstrasse 3-5
35576 Wetzlar / DE
Opponent's representative
Heuckeroth, Volker, et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2011/16]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Leica Camera AG
Oskar-Barnack-Str. 11
35606 Solms / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Siebensterngasse 54
1070 Wien / AT
 02  09.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Analytik Jena AG
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
7745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Oehmke, Volker, et al
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
 03  08.03.2011   
Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH
Gloelstrasse 3-5
35576 Wetzlar / DE
Opponent's representative
Heuckeroth, Volker, et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2011/15]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Leica Camera AG
Oskar-Barnack-Str. 11
35606 Solms / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Siebensterngasse 54
1070 Wien / AT
 02  09.03.2011  10.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Analytik Jena AG
Konrad-Zuse-Strasse 1
7745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Oehmke, Volker, et al
Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13
07743 Jena / DE
Former [2011/14]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2011   
Leica Camera AG
Oskar-Barnack-Str. 11
35606 Solms / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Siebensterngasse 54
1070 Wien / AT
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/46]
15.06.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.08.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2012
06.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
12.09.2012Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2012Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.04.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.10.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
01.10.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/13]
05.01.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
03.04.2019Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.05.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition26.06.2013Appeal received No.  T1225/13
20.08.2013Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
21.05.2013Appeal received No.  T1225/13
19.08.2013Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
13.06.2013Appeal received No.  T1225/13
14.08.2013Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
30.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
03.04.2019Date of oral proceedings
08.04.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Petition(s) for review:05.03.2015Petition for review received
 Number:  R0003/15
 for appeal No.  T1225/13-3402
 Petitioner:  APPR
28.11.2017Decision:  Petition for review allowed and re-opening of appeal procedure with total refund of fee for petition for review.
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
HU09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
TR09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
LU08.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
[2019/23]
Former [2013/45]CY09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
HU09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
TR09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
LU08.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2013/44]CY09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
TR09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
LU08.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2013/42]CY09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
BG09.09.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
LU08.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
Former [2011/41]CY09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2011/19]CY09.06.2010
DK09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
IT09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2011/16]CY09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
IT09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2011/13]CY09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
IS09.10.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2011/12]CY09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
RO09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
SK09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
PT11.10.2010
Former [2011/08]CY09.06.2010
EE09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
IE09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
NL09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
Former [2011/05]CY09.06.2010
FI09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
Former [2011/04]FI09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
PL09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
Former [2011/02]FI09.06.2010
LT09.06.2010
LV09.06.2010
SI09.06.2010
GR10.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US5500769  (BETENSKY ELLIS I [US]) [X] 1-9,13 * column 5, line 25 - line 52 * * column 6, line 12 - line 40 * * table 7 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]GB690278  (EMEL ETS) [X] 1 * page 2, line 31 - line 68 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3833633  (JENOPTIK JENA GMBH [DD]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 24 - line 28 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US2479792  (TACKABERRY ROBERT B) [X] 10-12 * column 1, line 40 - line 49 * * column 2, line 23 - line 29 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]GB303787  (OPTIQUE SA DES ANCIENS ETS LIS) [X] 10-12 * page 2, line 11 - line 36 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US3045545  (KORONES HERBERT D, et al) [X] 10-12 * column 1, line 46 - line 55 * * column 2, line 10 - line 17 * * table 1 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US3918791  (PERRY DONALD M) [X] 10-12 * column 1, line 61 - line 66 * * column 1, line 25 - line 45 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 23 * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - LU KAICHANG, ZHU YAFEI, KANG SONGGAO, "New type of large-angle binocular microtelescopes", SPIE CURRENT DEVELOPMENTS IN OPTICAL DESIGN AND OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (1991), vol. 1527, pages 413 - 418, XP002404670 [A] 1 * pages 413,415; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.48672
 [A]  - MICHAEL BASS, Handbook of optics, USA, MCGRAW-HILL,INC, (1995), XP002404673 [A] 1 * page 2.4 - page 2.11 *
 [A]  - DUNN J, "IMPROVED BINOCULAR DESIGN GIVES USERS A WIDER VIEW", THE ENGINEER, LONDON, GB, (19920521), page 36, XP002044199 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CLUNE L C, "OPTICAL PERFORMANCE OF REIMAGING WIDE FIELD-OF-VIEW (FOV) TELESCOPE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19860401), vol. 643, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 114 - 120, XP002044198 [A] 1 * page 114; figure 1 *
ExaminationWO2006081411
 US4172634
 GB191121621