Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1848243

EP1848243 - Multi-channel echo compensation system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Göring-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
[2007/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Buck, Markus, Dr.
Lindelestrasse, 09
88400 - Biberach / DE
02 / Haulick, Tim
In den Schlosswiesen, 14
89143 - Blaubeuren / DE
03 / Rössler, Martin
Weissenburgweg, 03
89077 - Ulm / DE
04 / Schmidt, Gerhard
Jörg-Syrlin-Strasse, 26
89081 - Ulm / DE
 [2007/43]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06008006.618.04.2006
[2007/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1848243
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1848243
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04R3/02, H04M9/08
[2007/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/43]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Mehrkanal-Echokompensation[2007/43]
English:Multi-channel echo compensation system and method[2007/43]
French:Système et procédé pour suppression d'echo multivoies[2007/43]
Examination procedure21.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/23]
08.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2008Fee for grant paid
17.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
IE18.04.2009
LU18.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE18.04.2009
LU18.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/22]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE18.04.2009
LU18.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/16]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE18.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/02]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE18.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/25]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
IE18.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/13]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/01]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US6738480  (BERTHAULT FREDERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-31 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 7 - line 55 * * column 4, line 4 - line 14 * * column 4, line 24 - line 28 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 6 * * column 9, line 14 - line 60 * * column 10, line 24 - line 30 *;
 [A]US2005213747  (POPOVICH STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1406397  (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JACOB BENESTY ET AL, A Hybrid Mono/Stereo Acoustic Echo Canceler, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199809), ISSN 1063-6676, XP011054323 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *