Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1870489

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 19.04.2009
 BELapse: 30.04.2009
 BGLapse: 18.09.2008
 CH 
CYLapse: 18.06.2008
 CZ 
 DE 
 DKLapse: 18.06.2008
 EELapse: 18.06.2008
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 19.09.2008
 HU 
 IELapse: 18.06.2008
 ISLapse: 18.10.2008
 IT 
LI 
 LTLapse: 18.06.2008
 LULapse: 19.04.2009
LVLapse: 18.06.2008
 MCLapse: 30.04.2009
 NL 
 PL 
 PT 
 ROLapse: 18.06.2008
 SE 
 SILapse: 18.06.2008
 SKLapse: 18.06.2008
 TR 
Examination procedure28.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted18.06.2008
Opposition procedure24.07.2012Fee for printing new specification paid 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20070321
 
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:18.06.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:18.06.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:502006000960
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20080731
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:20.08.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:03.09.2008 
Event description:PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:30.09.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20080918
 
Event date:14.10.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:16.12.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2309855 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:28.01.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E003977 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20081018
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:27.02.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:27.02.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:04.03.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:22.04.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:METEC GMBH
Effective DATE:20090318
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080918
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:01.07.2009 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:METEC GMBH
 
Event date:31.10.2009 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:ROPAL A.G.
Effective DATE:20090430
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090430
 
Event date:31.05.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090430
 
Event date:31.08.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090419
 
Event date:29.10.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080919
 
Event date:29.04.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090419
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080618
 
Event date:17.10.2012 
Event description:MAINTAINED AS AMENDED
Effective DATE:20121017
 
Event date:17.10.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AEN
Code Expl.: MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT
Free Format Text:AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM
 
Event date:06.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
Effective DATE:20121017
 
Event date:05.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE RPEO
Code Expl.: EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO
 
Event date:27.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:11.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES DC2A 2309855 ES T5
Code Expl.: PATENT MODIFIED
Effective DATE:20130311
 
Event date:29.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T5
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION OF MODIFIED EP PATENT
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121017
 
Event date:15.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE
 
Event date:05.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE
Effective DATE:20130715
 
Event date:05.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:ROPAL EUROPE AG, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ROPAL AG, ZUG, CH
Effective DATE:20130715
 
Event date:05.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE
Effective DATE:20130715
 
Event date:10.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE
 
Event date:16.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:ROPAL EUROPE AG, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ROPAL EUROPE AG, 35108 ALLENDORF, DE
Effective DATE:20150310
 
Event date:16.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 502006000960 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE
Effective DATE:20150310
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150326 AND 20150401
 
Event date:07.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:ROPAL EUROPE AG, DE
Effective DATE:20150703
 
Event date:15.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PCOW
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)
Free Format Text:NEW ADDRESS: DAMMSTRASSE 19, 6301 ZUG (CH)
 
Event date:15.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PCOW
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)
Free Format Text:NEW ADDRESS: AUF DEN ROEDERN 3, 35099 BURGWALD (DE)
 
Event date:15.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:ROPAL EUROPE AG, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ROPAL AG, CH
 
Event date:26.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20160425
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:11.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170428
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170511
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20170419
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20170512
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170503
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20170522
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20170419
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20170530
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20170419
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20170511
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20170419
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20170508
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:01.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:29.06.2018 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20180412
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:15.07.2010 
Event description:CEASED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:15.11.2012 
Event description:APPLICATION LAPSED SECTION 142(2)(D) - NO CONTINUATION FEE PAID FOR THE APPLICATION
 
Event date:26.09.2017 
Event description:TECHNICAL EXAMINATION (OPINION): PUBLICATION OF TECHNICAL EXAMINATION (OPINION)
 
Event date:20.03.2018 
Event description:TECHNICAL EXAMINATION (OPINION): PUBLICATION OF TECHNICAL EXAMINATION (OPINION)
 
Event date:26.11.2008 
Event description:EXAMINATION REQUEST
 
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:PUBLICATION
 
Event date:22.04.2009 
Event description:ENTRY INTO SUBSTANTIVE EXAMINATION
 
Event date:13.03.2013 
Event description:GRANT OF PATENT OR UTILITY MODEL
 
Event date:09.10.2013 
Event description:TRANSFER OF PATENT APPLICATION OR PATENT RIGHT OR UTILITY MODEL
 
Event date:09.10.2013 
Event description:SUCCESSION OR ASSIGNMENT OF PATENT RIGHT
Owner Name:ROPAL EUROPE AG
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ROPAL AG
Effective DATE:20130913
 
Event date:04.06.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION AGAINST THE PATENT
 
Event date:06.12.2012 
Event description:EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
Ref Document Number:1870489
Country of Ref Document:EP
Effective DATE:20121017
 
Event date:14.04.2010 
Event description:WRITTEN REQUEST FOR APPLICATION EXAMINATION
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A621
Effective DATE:20100413
 
Event date:11.10.2012 
Event description:REPORT ON RETRIEVAL
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A971007
Effective DATE:20121011
 
Event date:17.10.2012 
Event description:NOTIFICATION OF REASONS FOR REFUSAL
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A131
Effective DATE:20121016
 
Event date:17.01.2013 
Event description:WRITTEN REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A601
Effective DATE:20130116
 
Event date:24.01.2013 
Event description:WRITTEN PERMISSION OF EXTENSION OF TIME
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A602
Effective DATE:20130123
 
Event date:16.04.2013 
Event description:WRITTEN AMENDMENT
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A523
Effective DATE:20130415
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:NOTIFICATION OF REASONS FOR REFUSAL
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A131
Effective DATE:20130514
 
Event date:10.08.2013 
Event description:WRITTEN REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A601
Effective DATE:20130809
 
Event date:19.08.2013 
Event description:WRITTEN PERMISSION OF EXTENSION OF TIME
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A602
Effective DATE:20130816
 
Event date:15.11.2013 
Event description:WRITTEN AMENDMENT
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A523
Effective DATE:20131114
 
Event date:18.12.2013 
Event description:NOTIFICATION OF REASONS FOR REFUSAL
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A131
Effective DATE:20131217
 
Event date:18.03.2014 
Event description:WRITTEN REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A601
Effective DATE:20140317
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:WRITTEN PERMISSION OF EXTENSION OF TIME
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A602
Effective DATE:20140325
 
Event date:18.06.2014 
Event description:WRITTEN AMENDMENT
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A523
Effective DATE:20140617
 
Event date:26.12.2014 
Event description:DECISION OF GRANT OR REJECTION WRITTEN
 
Event date:07.01.2015 
Event description:WRITTEN DECISION TO GRANT A PATENT OR TO GRANT A REGISTRATION (UTILITY MODEL)
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A01
Effective DATE:20150106
 
Event date:12.02.2015 
Event description:FIRST PAYMENT OF ANNUAL FEES (DURING GRANT PROCEDURE)
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: A61
Effective DATE:20150203
 
Event date:13.02.2015 
Event description:CERTIFICATE OF PATENT OR REGISTRATION OF UTILITY MODEL
Ref Document Number:5693002
Country of Ref Document:JP
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: R150
 
Event date:20.02.2018 
Event description:RECEIPT OF ANNUAL FEES
Free Format Text:JAPANESE INTERMEDIATE CODE: R250
 
Event date:17.04.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION
 
Event date:01.10.2013 
Event description:NOTIFICATION OF REASON FOR REFUSAL
 
Event date:01.04.2014 
Event description:AMENDMENT
 
Event date:18.07.2014 
Event description:DECISION TO REFUSE APPLICATION
 
Event date:20.10.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR TRIAL AGAINST REFUSAL DECISION
 
Event date:19.11.2014 
Event description:AMENDMENT
 
Event date:13.01.2015 
Event description:MAINTENANCE OF ORIGINAL DECISION AFTER RE-EXAMINATION BEFORE A TRIAL
 
Event date:23.09.2015 
Event description:TRIAL DECISION
Free Format Text:TRIAL DECISION FOR APPEAL AGAINST DECISION TO DECLINE REFUSAL REQUESTED 20141020
Effective DATE:20150923
 
Event date:23.11.2015 
Event description:APPEAL (BEFORE THE PATENT COURT)
Free Format Text:APPEAL AGAINST DECISION TO DECLINE REFUSAL
 
Event date:07.01.2016 
Event description:WRITTEN JUDGEMENT (PATENT COURT)
Free Format Text:JUDGMENT (PATENT COURT) FOR APPEAL AGAINST DECISION TO DECLINE REFUSAL REQUESTED 20151123
Effective DATE:20160106
 
Event date:19.06.2015 
Event description:GRANT OR REGISTRATION
 
Event date:20.05.2016 
Event description:OFFICIAL REGISTRATION OF THE TRANSFER OF EXCLUSIVE RIGHT
Effective DATE:20160428
 
Event date:10.11.2016 
Event description:LICENCE ON USE OF PATENT
Free Format Text:LICENCE
Effective DATE:20161018
 
Event date:09.01.2009 
Event description:ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:ROPAL AG, SWITZERLAND
Free Format Text:ASSIGNMENT OF ASSIGNORS INTEREST;ASSIGNORS:KOCH, MATTHIAS;WUBBELING, GUIDO;SIGNING DATES FROM 20081122 TO 20081211;REEL/FRAME:022081/0232
 
Event date:09.01.2009 
Event description:ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:ROPAL AG,SWITZERLAND
Free Format Text:ASSIGNMENT OF ASSIGNORS INTEREST;ASSIGNORS:KOCH, MATTHIAS;WUBBELING, GUIDO;SIGNING DATES FROM 20081122 TO 20081211;REEL/FRAME:022081/0232
 
Event date:06.08.2013 
Event description:ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:ROPAL EUROPE AG, GERMANY
Free Format Text:DECLARATION REGISTERING TRANSFER OF PATENT RIGHTS;ASSIGNOR:ROPAL AG;REEL/FRAME:030968/0880
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:27.02.2008 
Event description:EP: THE EPO HAS BEEN INFORMED BY WIPO THAT EP WAS DESIGNATED IN THIS APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:07724314
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
 
Event date:17.06.2008 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:MX/A/2008/007898
Country of Ref Document:MX
 
Event date:17.06.2008 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:MX/a/2008/007898
Country of Ref Document:MX
 
Event date:27.06.2008 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:2635713
Country of Ref Document:CA
 
Event date:11.07.2008 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:200780002385.3
Country of Ref Document:CN
 
Event date:22.07.2008 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:2009505768
Country of Ref Document:JP
 
Event date:21.10.2008 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:2007241409
Country of Ref Document:AU
 
Event date:21.10.2008 
Event description:NON-ENTRY INTO THE NATIONAL PHASE IN:
Ref Country Code:DE
 
Event date:13.11.2008 
Event description:ENTRY INTO THE NATIONAL PHASE IN:
Ref Document Number:2007241409
Country of Ref Document:AU
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20070417
Kind Code of Ref Document:A
 
Event date:19.11.2008 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:2008145222
Country of Ref Document:RU
 
Event date:24.06.2009 
Event description:EP: PCT APPLICATION NON-ENTRY IN EUROPEAN PHASE
Ref Document Number:07724314
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
 
Event date:20.07.2009 
Event description:WIPO INFORMATION: ENTRY INTO NATIONAL PHASE
Ref Document Number:12295188
Country of Ref Document:US
 
Event date:19.04.2011 
Event description:ENTRY INTO THE NATIONAL PHASE IN:
Ref Document Number:PI0707130
Country of Ref Document:BR
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Effective DATE:20080714