Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1718017

EP1718017 - Method and apparatus for polling transmission status in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
2nd Floor, The Axis
26 Cybercity
Ebene 72201 / MU
[2014/25]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
Innovative Sonic Limited
Offshore incorporations centre Road Town P.O. Box 957
Tortola / VG
Former [2006/44]For all designated states
ASUSTeK Computer Inc.
4F, No. 150, Li-Te Rd. Peitou
Taipei City / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Jiang, Sam Shiaw-Shiang, c/o ASUSTeK COMPUTER INC.
4F, No. 150, Li-Te Road, Peitou
Taipei City, Taiwan / TW
 [2006/44]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2006/44]Hager, Thomas Johannes
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date06008830.927.04.2006
[2006/44]
Priority number, dateUS20050594697P29.04.2005         Original published format: US 594697 P
[2006/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1718017
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1718017
Date:23.01.2008
[2008/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1718017
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/64
[2006/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/44]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abrufung des Sendezustands in einem schnurlosen Kommunikationssystem[2006/44]
English:Method and apparatus for polling transmission status in a wireless communication system[2006/44]
French:Procédé et dispositif d' interrogation de l' état de transmission dans un système de communication sans fil[2006/44]
Examination procedure27.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/44]
14.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2010Fee for grant paid
05.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.11.2010   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/01]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.2010   
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
11.01.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.05.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.03.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition31.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1232/17
31.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1232/17
31.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
06.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
LT24.02.2010
LV24.02.2010
PL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
TR24.02.2010
IE27.04.2010
LU27.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
IS24.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
HU25.08.2010
[2015/22]
Former [2011/12]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
LT24.02.2010
LV24.02.2010
PL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
IE27.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
IS24.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2011/08]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
DK24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
LT24.02.2010
LV24.02.2010
PL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
IE27.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
IS24.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2011/02]AT24.02.2010
BE24.02.2010
CY24.02.2010
CZ24.02.2010
EE24.02.2010
LT24.02.2010
LV24.02.2010
PL24.02.2010
RO24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
SK24.02.2010
MC30.04.2010
BG24.05.2010
GR25.05.2010
IS24.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Former [2010/40]AT24.02.2010
LT24.02.2010
LV24.02.2010
PL24.02.2010
SI24.02.2010
IS24.06.2010
PT25.06.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]  - ASUSTEK, "R2-042255", INTERNET CITATION, (20041008), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/25322-CRs.htm, (20071026), XP002456616 [X] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 11.3.2 *
 [A]  - YI-CHIUN CHEN ET AL, "Simulation analysis of rlc for packet data simulation an services in umts systems", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2003. PIMRC 2003. 14TH IEEE PROCEEDINGS ON SEPT. 7-10, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030907), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7822-9, pages 926 - 930, XP010681730 [A] 1-4 * page 927, column LEFT, line 32 - line 44 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2003.1264409