Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1719944

EP1719944 - A quick connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TI Group Automotive Systems, L.L.C.
12345 East Nine Mile Road
Warren, MI 48090 / US
[2006/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Kerin, Jim
2134 Beaufait
Grosse Pointe Woods, Michigan 48236 / US
02 / Pepe, Richard M.
19918 Keats Court
Macomb, Michigan 48044 / US
03 / Koshay, Robert A.
17872 Bayside Drive
Macombe, Michigan 48042 / US
 [2006/45]
Representative(s)Rohmann, Michael , et al
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/45]Rohmann, Michael , et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Theaterplatz 3
45127 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date06008940.628.04.2006
[2006/45]
Priority number, dateUS20050677157P03.05.2005         Original published format: US 677157 P
US20060411504P26.04.2006         Original published format: US 411504 P
[2006/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1719944
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1719944
Date:01.10.2008
[2008/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1719944
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:F16L37/12
[2006/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/24]
Former [2006/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schnellkupplung[2006/45]
English:A quick connector[2006/45]
French:Raccord rapide[2006/45]
Examination procedure30.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/20]
02.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.05.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
06.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2010Fee for grant paid
30.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10163632.2  / EP2213929
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.04.2011  18.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HUTCHINSON
2, rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Gevers & Orès
Immeuble le Palatin 2
3 Cours du Triangle
CS 80165
92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2016/36]
Opponent(s)01  28.04.2011  18.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HUTCHINSON
2, rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
FR-75008 Paris / FR
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  28.04.2011  18.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HUTCHINSON
2, rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Gevers & Orès
36 rue de Saint-Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2011/23]
Opponent(s)01  28.04.2011   
HUTCHINSON
2, rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Bolinches, Michel Jean-Marie
Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
15.06.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.09.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.01.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0549/14
13.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
15.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4591192  (VAN EXEL GARY A [US], et al) [X] 26,31 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 24; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP1359361  (TI AUTOMOTIVE FULDABRUECK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,27 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]US5452924  (KUJAWSKI RICK A [US]) [A] 26 * column 2, line 32 - column 5, line 17; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0728981  (BUNDY CORP [US]) [A] 26 * column 2, line 53 - column 8, line 57; figure 14 *