Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1719797

EP1719797 - Starch-vegetable oil graft copolymers and their biofiber composites, and a process for their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Michigan State University
238 Administration Building
East Lansing, Michigan 48824 / US
[2006/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Narayan, Ramani
4275 Conifer Circle
Okemos, Michigan 48864 / US
02 / Balakrishnan, Sunder Samridhi, Old No.3, New No.5
4th Trust Cross st. Mandevelipakkam
Chennai 600028 Tamil Nadu / IN
03 / Shin, Boo-Young
214-1 Dea-Dong Gyeongsan
Kyougsan 712-749 / KR
 [2006/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06009139.403.05.2006
[2006/45]
Priority number, dateUS2005012449106.05.2005         Original published format: US 124491
[2006/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1719797
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1719797
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08L3/06, C08B31/04
[2006/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/45]
TitleGerman:Pflanzliches-Öl-Stärkepfropfcopolymere und ihre Biofaserverbundwerkstoffe und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[2008/37]
English:Starch-vegetable oil graft copolymers and their biofiber composites, and a process for their manufacture[2006/45]
French:Polymères greffés d'amidon et huile végétale et leur matériaux composites avec de biofibres et leur procédé de fabrication[2006/45]
Former [2006/45]Pflanzliches Öl - Stärkepfropfcopolymere und ihre Biofaserverbundwerkstoffe und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung
Examination procedure03.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/45]
09.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2008Fee for grant paid
08.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
LU03.05.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
LU03.05.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
LU03.05.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2011/02]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/13]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/04]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/01]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US5654353  (LI YUNZHENG [CN], et al) [X] 1-26 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 38 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US5618341  (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * example - *;
 [X]  FANG J M ET AL, "An investigation of the use of recovered vegetable oil for the preparation of starch thermoplastics", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (20021201), vol. 50, no. 4, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 429 - 434, XP004378751 [X] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(02)00123-6
 [A]  SAGAR A D ET AL, "PROPERTIES OF FATTY-ACID ESTERS OF STARCH", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. NEW YORK, US, (19951128), vol. 58, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 1647 - 1656, XP000537861 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1995.070580927
 [A]  ABURTO J ET AL, "Synthesis, characterization, and biodegradability of fatty-acid esters of amylose and starch", J. APPL. POLYM. SCI.; JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE 1999 JOHN WILEY & SONS INC, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (1999), vol. 74, no. 6, pages 1440 - 1451, XP002396361 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4628(19991107)74:6<1440::AID-APP17>3.0.CO;2-V