EP1721998 - Aluminium alloy extruded tube material for heat exchanger using natural refrigerant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corporation 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2010/43] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corporation 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4 Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ninomiya, Junji, c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminium Corp. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Satoshi, c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminium Corp. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kashiwazaki, Kazuhisa, c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminium 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Katou, Kazumi, c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminium 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Oya, Yoshiyuki, c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminium 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Nakamura, Tomohiko, c/o Denso Corp. 1-1, Showacho Kariya-shi, Aichi / JP | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009528.8 | 09.05.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | JP20050137845 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005137845 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721998 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1721998 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
C22C21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stranggepresstes Rohrteil aus Aluminium-Legierung für Wärmetauscher mit natürlichem Kühlmittel | [2010/27] | English: | Aluminium alloy extruded tube material for heat exchanger using natural refrigerant | [2006/46] | French: | Matériau tubulaire extrudé en alliage d'aluminium pour échangeur de chaleur avec réfrigérant naturel | [2010/27] |
Former [2006/46] | Werkstoff für stranggepresstes Rohr aus Aluminium-Legierung für Wärmetauscher mit natürlichem Kühlmittel | ||
Former [2006/46] | Matériau pour tube extrudé en alliage d'aluminium pour échangeur de chaleur avec réfrigérant naturel | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000087168 ; | [X]US3938991 (SPERRY PHILIP R, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 32 - line 62 * * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 13; examples I,II * * claim - *; | [A]EP0315789 (INTEVEP SA [VE]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]EP1484425 (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000087168 A 20000328 (MITSUBISHI ALUM CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 9; example z; table 4 * | by applicant | JP2000087168 |