Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1698905 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1698905



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 617
10.01.2020 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
07.01.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
12.12.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
02.08.2019 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 3
02.08.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
02.08.2019 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
27.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.06.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.06.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.04.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
05.04.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
05.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.04.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.03.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
15.03.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
15.03.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
12.03.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.12.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
07.12.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
14.11.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
17.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
14.01.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.01.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
23.09.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.09.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
06.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
30.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
02.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.05.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
06.05.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
06.05.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
06.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.02.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
24.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.01.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
08.01.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.01.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
08.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
22.08.2013 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
02.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
17.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.12.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
29.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.08.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.05.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2012 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
17.04.2012 Observations by third parties Opposition 5
17.04.2012 Observations by third parties Opposition 7
14.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
14.04.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
14.04.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
14.04.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
14.04.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
13.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.04.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.04.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.04.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.04.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
13.04.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
12.10.2011 Confirmation of the correction of a decision Search / examination 1
10.09.2011 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
07.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.09.2011 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.03.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
11.03.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
11.03.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
03.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
03.03.2011 Description Search / examination 12
03.03.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
03.03.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.03.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
28.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2011 Description Search / examination 12
28.02.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
28.02.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.02.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
18.10.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.10.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.10.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.10.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
12.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
12.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
10.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.06.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.06.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
29.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
26.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.10.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.10.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
09.08.2008 Description Search / examination 10
09.08.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
07.08.2008 Description Search / examination 10
07.08.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.08.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.06.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.06.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.2007 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.07.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.06.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.06.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 4
15.06.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
21.11.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.11.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
23.09.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.09.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
01.09.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.08.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
09.08.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.06.2006 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 6
10.05.2006 Description Search / examination 51
10.05.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Drawings Search / examination 15
10.05.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 5
10.05.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
10.05.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7