EP1808206 - Storage medium storing video game program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states NINTENDO CO., LTD. 11-1, Hokotake-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dohta, Takuhiro c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1, Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06009646.8 | 10.05.2006 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | JP20050267180 | 14.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005267180 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1808206 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1808206 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/06, A63F13/10 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A63F13/42 (EP,US);
A63F13/211 (EP);
A63F13/213 (EP,US);
A63F13/22 (EP);
A63F13/235 (EP);
A63F13/426 (EP);
G06F3/0325 (US);
A63F2300/1006 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1018 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1031 (EP);
A63F2300/105 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1087 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6045 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | A63F13/10 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2014/18] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium für Videospielprogramm | [2007/29] | English: | Storage medium storing video game program | [2007/29] | French: | Support d'enregistrement pour jeu vidéo | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8804060 (STARPEAK COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,12,14 * abstract * * page 15 *; | [A]EP0852961 (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,12,14 * abstract * * column 10 *; | [Y]US5999185 (KATO NOBUKO [JP], et al) [Y] 3-11,13 * abstract * * column 10, line 50 - line 59 * * column 13, line 22 - line 27 * * column 14, line 37 - line 59 * * column 15, line 45 - line 53 * * column 17, line 57 - line 63 * * column 27, line 22 - column 28, line 2 *; | [A]WO0060534 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,12,14 * abstract *; | [A]US2002107069 (ISHINO YUKINOBU [JP]) [A] 1,2,12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] *; | [Y]WO02100284 (VOLUME INTERACTIONS PTE LTD [SG], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract ** page 11, line 16 - line 27 *; | [XY]WO2004012130 (ANDAMIRO CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,12,14 * abstract * * page 22, line 3 - line 12 * [Y] 3-11,13; | [E]EP1762287 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2,12,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0118] , [0155] , [0181] * * paragraph [0197] - paragraph [0202] *; | [L]EP1764140 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [L] 3-11,13 * claims 1-11 * |