Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1857155 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1857155



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 145
27.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.10.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.09.2010 Closing of application Search / examination 2
03.09.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 23
01.03.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
29.12.2009 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
02.11.2009 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
27.10.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.09.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.09.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
21.07.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.07.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.07.2009 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
08.07.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 3
29.05.2009 Grounds for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
02.04.2009 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
17.02.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.02.2009 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.07.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
26.11.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.10.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.07.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
19.07.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.05.2007 Annex Search / examination 10
25.04.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 18
24.04.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.04.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.04.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.04.2007 Description Search / examination 4
24.04.2007 Drawings Search / examination 3
05.03.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.03.2007 Declaration that a search is not possible Search / examination 1
05.03.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 2
05.03.2007 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
15.02.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.01.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.10.2006 Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee Search / examination 3
10.07.2006 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.2006 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
14.06.2006 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
14.06.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
16.05.2006 Description Search / examination 4
16.05.2006 Drawings Search / examination 6
16.05.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6