Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1693213

EP1693213 - Ink cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/34]Ink cartridge, and ink-jet recording apparatus using the same
[2008/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2010
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[2009/49]
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishizawa, Taku
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano 932-8502 / JP
02 / Kumagai, Toshio
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano 932-8502 / JP
03 / Kamijyo, Masanori
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano 932-8502 / JP
 [2006/34]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/34]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06010113.622.01.2001
[2006/34]
Priority number, dateJP2000001246121.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000012461
JP2000001246221.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000012462
JP2000002102031.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000021020
JP2000002441901.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000024419
JP2000018605021.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000186050
JP2000020198304.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000201983
[2006/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1693213
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1693213
Date:14.02.2007
[2007/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1693213
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2006/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2006/34]
TitleGerman:Tintenpatrone[2008/51]
English:Ink cartridge[2008/51]
French:Cassette d'encre[2008/51]
Former [2006/34]Tintenpatrone und Tintenstrahldruckvorrichtung mit einer derartigen Tintenpatrone
Former [2006/34]Ink cartridge, and ink-jet recording apparatus using the same
Former [2006/34]Cassette d'encre et appareil d'enregistrement par jet d'encre l'utilisant
Examination procedure14.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/39]
20.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2009Fee for grant paid
16.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01101145.9  / EP1120258
Divisional application(s)EP07015950.4  / EP1849608
EP08001716.3  / EP1916114
Opposition(s)03.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
23.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
TR02.12.2009
IE22.01.2010
LU22.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
GR03.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
IE22.01.2010
LU22.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
GR03.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2011/08]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
IE22.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
GR03.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2011/02]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
GR03.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/40]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
MC31.01.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/30]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
Former [2010/25]CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH10138506  ;
 [X]EP0965451  (CANON KK) [X] 1-10 * page 14, line 19 - line 44; figure 16 *;
 [X]EP0927638  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 12 - line 53; figure 3 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 26; figure 4 *;
 [X]US6010210  (PAWLOWSKI JR NORMAN E ET AL) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 54 - line 61; figures 1,2,5,10 * * column 6, line 8 - line 24; figures 8,10 * * column 8, line 11 - line 29; figure 11 *;
 [X]US5912688  (GRAGG BRIAN D) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 35; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0778145  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [A] 1-10 * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 50; figures 8-11 *;
 [A]US5852459  (PAWLOWSKI JR NORMAN E ET AL) [A] 1,6 * column 11, line 22 - line 42; figures 18-25 * * column 18, line 47 - column 19, line 29; figures 37,38 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10138506 A 19980526 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract *