blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1729387

EP1729387 - Line fixation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.04.2019
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, IL 60025 / US
[2019/17]
Former [2008/04]For all designated states
TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH
Industriestrasse 2-8
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Former [2006/49]For all designated states
TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG
Am Pulverhäuschen 7
67677 Enkenbach/Alsenborn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jatzke Stefan
Neugasse 13
67280 Ebertsheim / DE
 [2006/49]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/51]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/02]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2006/49]Strass, Jürgen
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date06011230.731.05.2006
[2006/49]
Priority number, dateDE20052008570U01.06.2005         Original published format: DE 202005008570 U
[2006/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1729387
Date:06.12.2006
Language:DE
[2006/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1729387
Date:09.07.2008
[2008/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1729387
Date:21.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2008
ClassificationIPC:H02G3/32
[2006/49]
CPC:
F16L3/223 (EP,US); B60R16/0215 (EP,US); F16L55/035 (EP,US);
H02G3/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/49]
TitleGerman:Befestigungsvorrichtung für eine Leitung[2006/49]
English:Line fixation device[2006/49]
French:Dispositif de fixation d'une ligne[2006/49]
Examination procedure19.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/01]
17.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2011Fee for grant paid
03.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.12.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.08.2012  03.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
A. RAYMOND ET CIE
113, Cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
Opponent's representative
König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB München
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/51]
Opponent(s)01  25.08.2012  03.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
A. RAYMOND ET CIE
113, Cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
Opponent's representative
König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
DE-40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  25.08.2012  03.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
A. RAYMOND ET CIE
113, Cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
Opponent's representative
RACKETTE Partnerschaft Patentanwälte
Postfach 1310
79013 Freiburg / DE
Former [2012/40]
Opponent(s)01  25.08.2012   
A. RAYMOND ET CIE
113, Cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
Opponent's representative
Rüttgers, Joachim
A. Raymond GmbH & Co. KG Teichstrasse 57
79539 Lörrach / DE
29.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.12.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.03.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/20]
01.04.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.01.2014Appeal received No.  T0257/14
20.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
20.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
20.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
27.03.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.05.2006
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
AT31.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
LU31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IT31.05.2013
ES01.06.2013
[2014/37]
Former [2014/34]HU31.05.2006
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
AT31.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
LU31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IT31.05.2013
Former [2014/27]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
AT31.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
LU31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IT31.05.2013
Former [2014/21]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
AT31.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IT31.05.2013
Former [2014/11]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
AT31.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IT31.05.2013
Former [2013/36]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
AT31.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/37]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
Former [2012/36]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/35]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/34]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/28]CY21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT21.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2098699  (TUCKER FASTENERS LTD) [Y] 2,6 * page 2, lines 22-25; figures 1-4 *;
 [XDY]DE8900984U  (VORWERK & SOHN GMBH & CO KG, 5600 WUPPERTAL, DE) [XD] 1,3,4,7,9 * page 5, lines 9-28; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8,2,6;
 [Y]EP0628737  (TRW CARR FRANCE SNC [FR]) [Y] 8 * column 3, lines 1-7; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE19735509  (MECANO RAPID GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 7; figures 1-5 *
by applicantDE8900984U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.