Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1729387 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1729387



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 559
10.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.04.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.04.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
01.04.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.04.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
27.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.03.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.03.2019 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 5
21.03.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
21.03.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
20.03.2019 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 1
20.03.2019 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
18.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.03.2019 All other documents for the Appeal procedure not covered by any other Code Appeal 1
18.03.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
18.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 4
18.03.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
18.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.03.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
14.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 4
14.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.03.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
13.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.03.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
11.03.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
08.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
07.03.2019 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Appeal 1
07.03.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 13
04.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 15
04.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.03.2019 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 2
01.03.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
14.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.12.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
20.12.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
19.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.11.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
09.11.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.11.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
05.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.11.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.11.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
30.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.10.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.10.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.10.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
23.10.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.08.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.10.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
08.12.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
25.11.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Authorisation Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
17.11.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
17.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.11.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
28.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
21.07.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
28.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
19.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
21.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.11.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.09.2014 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
18.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
28.05.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.03.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 10
20.03.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
10.02.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.02.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.02.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
11.12.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.12.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
11.12.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.12.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
11.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.11.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.10.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
02.10.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
26.09.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 27
26.09.2013 Claims Opposition 1
26.09.2013 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
06.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
26.06.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.06.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.06.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
12.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
06.03.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
18.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
05.02.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
05.02.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
29.10.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.10.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
25.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.11.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.11.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
14.07.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
14.07.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
31.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
31.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
31.05.2011 Description Search / examination 1
31.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.03.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.03.2011 General enquiry Search / examination 1
08.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.12.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.12.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.07.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 3
06.06.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
19.12.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
10.12.2007 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 6
08.11.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.07.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.07.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.06.2006 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.05.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
31.05.2006 Description Search / examination 5
31.05.2006 Drawings Search / examination 3
31.05.2006 Priority document Search / examination 12
31.05.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6