Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1862581

EP1862581 - Method for operating a domestic appliance, especially a home dryer or a washing machine, and domestic appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussels / BE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussel / BE
Former [2011/27]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussel / BE
Former [2011/11]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussels / BE
Former [2007/49]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Belgicastraat 17
1930 Zaventem / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Klug, Hans-Joachim
Birkenweg 3
90610 Winkelhaid / DE
02 / Kreutzfeldt, Uta
Heinrich-von-Stein-Strasse 229
92342 Freystadt / DE
03 / Sierl, Johannes
Hassfurter Strasse 4
90427 Nürnberg / DE
04 / Loy, Thomas
Grossgründlacher Hauptstrasse 21
90427 Nürnberg / DE
 [2007/49]
Representative(s)Electrolux Group Patents
AB Electrolux
Group Patents
105 45 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Nardoni, Andrea
Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30
33080 Porcia (PN) / IT
Former [2009/15]Nardoni, Andrea
Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30
33080 Porcia (PN) / IT
Former [2007/49]Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH, Patente, Marken & Lizenzen
90327 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date06011421.201.06.2006
[2007/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1862581
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1862581
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/04, D06F37/42, D06F35/00
[2007/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/49]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Haushaltsgeräts, insbesondere eines Trockners oder einer Waschmaschine, und Haushaltsgerät[2012/21]
English:Method for operating a domestic appliance, especially a home dryer or a washing machine, and domestic appliance[2007/49]
French:Procédé destiné à l'utilisation d'un appareil ménager, particulièrement un sécheur où une machine à laver, et un appareil ménager[2007/49]
Former [2007/49]Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Haushaltsgeräts, insbesondere eines Trockner oder einer Waschmaschine, und Haushaltsgerät
Examination procedure14.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
25.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2012Fee for grant paid
03.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  18.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Miele & Cie. KG Schutzrechte/Verträge
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  12.06.2013  18.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Miele & Cie. KG Schutzrechte/Verträge
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
17.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition09.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0330/16
08.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.06.2006
AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE01.06.2013
LU01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/20]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE01.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/08]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/28]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/23]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/22]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/20]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
Former [2013/09]FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
Former [2013/08]LT12.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]US5315727  (LEE KYU C [KR]) [X] 1,16 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 28 *;
 [A]EP1616990  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-23 * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1640494  (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0023] *;
 [A]DE3408136  (PASSAT MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-23 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5390385  (BELDHAM PAUL M [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 4, line 40 - line 44; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]EP1469120  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0049] , [0052]; figure 4 *;
 [X]WO03057966  (FRUM HANAN [IL]) [X] 1,3,4,23 * page 12, line 15 - line 17 * * page 13, lines 3-8 * * page 13, line 12 - line 13 *
by applicantWO03057966
 US5315727