Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1863258

EP1863258 - System and method for managing web services [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.11.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/49]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Viegener, Johannes, Dr.
Indianaring 7
76149 Karlsruhe / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald, Dr.
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
03 / Brauel, Bjoern
Engelmühlenweg 1a
64367 Mühltal / DE
04 / Heberer, Ulrich
Ringstrasse 27
64823 Gross-Umstadt / DE
 [2007/49]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/49]Wegner, Hans
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date06011491.502.06.2006
[2007/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1863258
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1863258
Date:14.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2007/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/35]
Former [2008/33](deleted) 
Former [2007/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Verwaltung von Webdiensten[2007/49]
English:System and method for managing web services[2007/49]
French:Système et procédé de gestion de services web[2007/49]
Examination procedure15.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/35]
27.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2008Fee for grant paid
24.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CY14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
IT14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
TR14.01.2009
BG14.04.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
IE02.06.2009
LU02.06.2009
PT15.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
HU15.07.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
IT14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
BG14.04.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
IE02.06.2009
LU02.06.2009
PT15.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
HU15.07.2009
Former [2011/22]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
IT14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
BG14.04.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
IE02.06.2009
LU02.06.2009
PT15.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2011/16]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
IT14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
BG14.04.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
IE02.06.2009
PT15.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2011/02]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
BG14.04.2009
SE14.04.2009
GR15.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
IE02.06.2009
PT15.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/25]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
BG14.04.2009
SE14.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
IE02.06.2009
PT15.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/13]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
BG14.04.2009
SE14.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
PT15.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/07]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
PT15.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/01]AT14.01.2009
BE14.01.2009
CZ14.01.2009
DK14.01.2009
EE14.01.2009
FI14.01.2009
LT14.01.2009
LV14.01.2009
NL14.01.2009
PL14.01.2009
RO14.01.2009
SI14.01.2009
SK14.01.2009
SE14.04.2009
ES25.04.2009
IS14.05.2009
PT15.06.2009
Former [2009/28]NL14.01.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005081495  (ORACLE INT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0023] , [0027] , [0032] , [0033] *;
 [DX]WO2004010297  (AMBERPOINT INC [US]) [DX] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0016] - [0018] , [0019] , [0021] , [0036] - [0040] - [0043] , [0044] , [0049] , [0051] - [0055] - [0062] - [0064] *;
 [X]US2006064483  (PATEL RIKIN S [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - [0016] - [0024] , [0029] , [0031] - [0033] *