Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1863258 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1863258



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 132
18.11.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.12.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.11.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.11.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
24.11.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
27.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.10.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.10.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
10.12.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.11.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2007 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
15.11.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.11.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 21
11.12.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.12.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 7
11.12.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
24.07.2006 Drawings Search / examination 5
24.07.2006 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
28.06.2006 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
02.06.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
02.06.2006 Description Search / examination 12
02.06.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Drawings Search / examination 5
02.06.2006 Drawings Search / examination 5
02.06.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6