Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1863258
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8180849Global Dossier 15.05.2012B2
US2007300240 27.12.2007A1
Priority number Date
EP06011491 02.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1863258Global Dossier 14.01.2009B1
EP1863258 05.12.2007A1
Priority number Date
EP06011491 02.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT421221T 15.01.2009T
Priority number Date
EP06011491 02.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN101087312B 04.07.2012B
CN101087312 12.12.2007A
Priority number Date
EP06011491 02.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE602006004856D 05.03.2009D1
Priority number Date
EP06011491 02.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1115776 07.08.2009A1
Priority number Date
EP06011491 02.06.2006