Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1867955

EP1867955 - Calibrated medical instrument with environment sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BrainLAB AG
Ammerthalstrasse 8
85551 Kirchheim/Heimstetten / DE
[2007/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Goldbach, Günter
Keltenschanz 1
85457 Wörth/Wifling / DE
 [2007/51]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2007/51]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date06011818.908.06.2006
[2007/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1867955
Date:19.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01D1/18, A61B19/00, A61B5/00, // A61B6/00
[2007/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kalibriertes medizintechnisches Instrument mit Umgebungssensor[2007/51]
English:Calibrated medical instrument with environment sensor[2007/51]
French:Dispositiv medicale calibré avec capteur d'environment[2007/51]
Examination procedure08.06.2006Examination requested  [2007/51]
04.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/15]
16.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/15]
Documents cited:Search[X]US6577976  (HOFF BRUCE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 35 - column 4, line 13 *;
 [XA]WO0167979  (ORTHOSOFT INC [CA]; JUTRAS SEBASTIEN [CA]; BROSSEAU ERIC [CA]; JANSEN) [X] 1-5,7,10,14,16,17 * page 2, lines 6-16 * * page 3, lines 16,17 * * page 7, lines 1-3 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 19 * [A] 6,8,9,11-13,15;
 [XA]US6104878  (TOGUCHI MICHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-7,9-14,16,17 * column 5, line 15 - column 10, line 22; figures 6,24 * * column 13, line 20 - column 19, line 64 * * column 21, lines 10-35; claims 8,10 * * column 22, line 39 * * column 24, lines 3-6 * * column 2, lines 45-60 * [A] 8,15;
 [XY]US2005080566  (VOCK CURTIS A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-6,9-15 [Y] 2;
 [XA]US2005247319  (BERGER J L [US]) [X] 1-6,9-11,13,15-17 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0030] , [0034] , [0035] , [0042] , [0043]; claims 17,18,20 * [A] 7,8,12,14;
 [XA]US5617857  (CHADER MARTIN D [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,12,14-17 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 7; figures 1,2,5 * * column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 5 * [A] 3,5,6,9,11,13;
 [XY]WO0191080  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]; WOOD CHRISTOPHER IVOR [GB]) [X] 10-12,16,17 * page 1, line 7; figure 7; claim 5 * * page 2, line 14 * * page 3, lines 1-3 * * page 3, line 27 * * page 4, lines 28-30 * * page 6, line 23; claim 24 * * page 9, line 20 * * page 16, line 12 - page 18, line 3 * [Y] 1-5,7,9,13-15;
 [Y]WO2005015125  (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA]; JAFFRAY DAVID [CA]; MOSELEY DOUGLAS [CA]; SI) [Y] 1-5,7,9,13-15 * page 8, lines 17-20 *;
 [X]DE10224864  (BAELZ GMBH HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1,3,10-12,16,17 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] - [0014] - [0024] , [0029]; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE20319131U  (KNUEPFER JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 9,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5481245  (MOLDAVSKY BORIS [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1413258  (BRAINLAB AG [DE]) [A] 2 * abstract *
 [A]  - WEBSTER, JOHN G., Medical Instrumentation Application and Design, USA, WILEY, (1998), XP002410441 [A] 1,10 * page 36; figure 1.8 *