EP1742390 - Method of installing a wireless security system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Patrick 95 Peaceful Trail NY 14609 Rochester / US | 02 /
Berube, James E. 1435 Tudor Way NY 14425 Farmington / US | 03 /
Herrmann, Falk 27 Blackwatch Trail NY 14450 Fairport / DE | 04 /
Wager, Scott 4513 Mayflower Road NY 14424 Canandaigua / US | 05 /
Schwarz, Gunther 16 Chelsea Way NY 14450 Fairport / US | [2010/49] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
Parker, Patrick A. 331 Coronado Drive NY 14617 Rochester / US | ||
02 /
Berube, James E. 1435 Tudor Way NY 14425 Farmington / US | |||
03 /
Herrmann, Falk 27 Blackwatch Trail NY 14450 Fairport / DE | |||
04 /
Wager, Scott 4513 Mayflower Road NY 14424 Canandaigua / US | |||
05 /
Schwarz, Gunther 16 Chelsea Way NY 14450 Fairport / US | Representative(s) | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06012369.2 | 16.06.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | US20050174886 | 05.07.2005 Original published format: US 174886 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742390 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1742390 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742390 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, G08B25/10 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
G08B25/10 (EP,US);
G08B25/003 (EP,US);
H04B17/23 (EP,US);
H04B17/309 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | H04B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Installationsverfahren für ein drahtloses Sicherheitssystem | [2007/02] | English: | Method of installing a wireless security system | [2007/02] | French: | Procédé pour installer un système de sécurité sans fil | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2011 | BE | 19.01.2011 | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IT | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | GB | 16.06.2011 | IE | 16.06.2011 | LU | 16.06.2011 | ES | 17.06.2011 | SE | 17.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HU | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 16.06.2011 | ||
SE | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 16.06.2011 | ||
SE | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 16.06.2011 | ||
SE | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
SE | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 16.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 19.01.2011 | |
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 19.01.2011 | |
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4603325 (MARINO FRANCIS C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 5, line 33 ** figure 1 *; | [X]WO03061176 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 5 * * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 26 * * claim 30 *; | [XA]EP1515463 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0048] * * figure 1 * [A] 1-13 | by applicant | US4603325 | WO03061176 | EP1515463 |