Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1777101

EP1777101 - Automobile seat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2011
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delta Kogyo Co., Ltd.
1-14, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP
[2007/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Kawashima, Yoshihito Delta Kogyo Co., Ltd.
1-14, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP
02 / Takeshima, Toru Delta Kogyo Co., Ltd.
1-14, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP
 [2010/38]
Former [2007/17]01 / Kawashima, Yoshihito Delta Kogyo Co., Ltd.
1-14, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP
02 / Takeshima, Toru Delta Kogyo Co., Ltd.
1-14, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 735-8501 / JP
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Former [2007/17]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date06012604.220.06.2006
[2007/17]
Priority number, dateJP2005030315618.10.2005         Original published format: JP 2005303156
[2007/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1777101
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1777101
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1777101
Date:22.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/427
[2007/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/44]
Former [2007/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kraftfahrzeugsitz[2007/17]
English:Automobile seat[2007/17]
French:Siège pour automobile[2007/17]
Examination procedure03.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
26.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.10.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
20.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2010Fee for grant paid
25.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE10013325  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,8 * paragraphs [0009] , [0017] , [0018] , [0022] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,7;
 [YA]EP1522452  (DELTA KOGYO CO [JP]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] * [A] ;
 [A]EP1053907  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * column 14, lines 20-38 * * column 16, lines 40-48 * * figure 1 *
by applicantJP2001039194
 JP2001163097
 JP2002274240
 JP2005303156