Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1872871

EP1872871 - Method and apparatus for loading and unloading containers in a mail processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.09.2009
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Berdelle-Hilge, Peter
Neuhauserstrasse 14b
78464 Konstanz / DE
 [2008/01]
Representative(s)Hellebrandt, Martin
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[2008/01]
Application number, filing date06013583.730.06.2006
[2008/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1872871
Date:02.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1872871
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/08
[2008/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Be- und Entladen von Containern bei einem System zum Postsortieren[2008/01]
English:Method and apparatus for loading and unloading containers in a mail processing system[2008/01]
French:Méthode et appareil pour décharger et charger de récipients dans un système de triage du courrier[2008/01]
Examination procedure20.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/14]
06.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2008Fee for grant paid
19.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CY05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
IT05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
TR05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
GR06.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
HU06.05.2009
IE30.06.2009
LU30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
IT05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
GR06.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
HU06.05.2009
IE30.06.2009
LU30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2011/22]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
IT05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
GR06.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
IE30.06.2009
LU30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2011/16]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
IT05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
GR06.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
CH30.06.2009
IE30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2011/02]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
GR06.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
IE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/25]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
IE30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/07]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
MC30.06.2009
Former [2010/01]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
CZ05.11.2008
DK05.11.2008
EE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
RO05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
SK05.11.2008
BG05.02.2009
SE05.02.2009
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
PT06.04.2009
Former [2009/32]AT05.11.2008
BE05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
Former [2009/28]AT05.11.2008
FI05.11.2008
LT05.11.2008
LV05.11.2008
NL05.11.2008
PL05.11.2008
SI05.11.2008
ES16.02.2009
IS05.03.2009
Former [2009/21]LT05.11.2008
ES16.02.2009
Former [2009/20]ES16.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US3148783  (SIDNEY MICHAELS) [A] 1,9 * column 24, line 40 - column 25, line 60; figure 45 *;
 [A]EP0424789  (SYSTEL INT SPA [IT]) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 30; figure 12 *;
 [A]FR1317438  (MAURICE MOISE LEVY) [A] 1,9 * pages 2-4; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2335639  (POST OFFICE [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 25 - page 5, line 29; figure 1 *