Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1754713

EP1754713 - Apo2L (Trail) receptor binding peptides and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/08]apo2l (trail) receptor binding peptides and uses thereof
[2008/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2007/08]For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Li, Bing
316 Dolphin Isle
Foster City CA 94044 / US
02 / Sidhu, Sachdev S.
1376 South Van Ness Avenue
San Francisco CA 94110 / US
 [2007/08]
Representative(s)Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/08]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date06013626.429.04.2004
[2007/08]
Priority number, dateUS20030469436P09.05.2003         Original published format: US 469436 P
[2007/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1754713
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1754713
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/04, A61K38/04, C07K14/705, C12N15/10
[2007/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/08]
TitleGerman:Peptide welche an Apo2L (Trail) Rezeptoren binden und Verwendungen davon[2008/37]
English:Apo2L (Trail) receptor binding peptides and uses thereof[2008/37]
French:Peptides se liant aux récepteurs Apo2L (Trail) et utilisations desdits peptides[2008/37]
Former [2007/08]peptide welche an apo2l (trail) rezeptoren binden und verwendungnen davon
Former [2007/08]apo2l (trail) receptor binding peptides and uses thereof
Former [2007/08]peptides se liant aux recepteurs apo2l (trail) et utilisations desdits peptides
Examination procedure17.07.2006Examination requested  [2007/08]
07.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.2009Fee for grant paid
06.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04760861.7  / EP1622929
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.07.2008Request for further processing filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
LU29.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/22]CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
LU29.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/25]CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/13]CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/01]CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
PT12.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]  CHUNTHARAPAI A ET AL, "Isotype-dependent inhibition of tumor growth in vivo by monoclonal antibodies to death receptor 4.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 APR 2001, (20010415), vol. 166, no. 8, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4891 - 4898, XP002300581 [A] 1-26 * page 4891, column R, paragraph 2 - page 4892, column R, paragraph 5; table I *
 [A]  GRIFFITH T S ET AL, "FUNCTIONAL ANALYSIS OF TRAIL RECEPTORS USING MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (1999), vol. 162, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2597 - 2605, XP002944456 [A] 1-26 * page 2597, column R, paragraph L - page 2598, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 2599 - page 2602 *
 [A]  ICHIKAWA K ET AL, "Tumoricidal activity of a novel anti-human DR5 monoclonal antibody without hepatocyte cytotoxicity", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (200108), vol. 7, no. 8, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 954 - 960, XP002956334 [A] 1-26 * page 954, column R, paragraph L - column L, paragraph 1; figures 1b-d *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/91000
 [A]  ASHKENAZI AVI, "Targeting death and decoy receptors of the tumour-necrosis factor superfamily.", NATURE REVIEWS. CANCER. JUN 2002, (200206), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1474-175X, pages 420 - 430, XP002300582 [A] 1-26 * page 424, column R, paragraph L - page 426, column R, paragraph 3; figure 3 *