Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1881675

EP1881675 - System and method for managing a plurality of web services [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.07.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/04]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schöning, Harald Dr.
Theobaldstr. 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
02 / Viegener, Johannes Dr.
Indianaring 7
76149 Karlsruhe / DE
03 / Swenson, Keith
6206 Purple Hills Drive
San Jose, CA 95119 / US
 [2008/04]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/04]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06015020.819.07.2006
[2008/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1881675
Date:23.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1881675
Date:24.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2008/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/04]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Verwaltung einer Mehrzahl von Webdiensten[2008/04]
English:System and method for managing a plurality of web services[2008/04]
French:Système et procédé de gestion d'une pluralité de services web[2008/04]
Examination procedure24.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/10]
24.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2008Fee for grant paid
21.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
CY24.09.2008
CZ24.09.2008
DK24.09.2008
EE24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
IT24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
NL24.09.2008
PL24.09.2008
RO24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
SK24.09.2008
TR24.09.2008
BG24.12.2008
SE24.12.2008
GR25.12.2008
IS24.01.2009
PT24.02.2009
HU25.03.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]AT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
CZ24.09.2008
DK24.09.2008
EE24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
IT24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
NL24.09.2008
PL24.09.2008
RO24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
SK24.09.2008
BG24.12.2008
SE24.12.2008
GR25.12.2008
IS24.01.2009
PT24.02.2009
HU25.03.2009
Former [2011/02]AT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
CZ24.09.2008
DK24.09.2008
EE24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
IT24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
NL24.09.2008
PL24.09.2008
RO24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
SK24.09.2008
BG24.12.2008
SE24.12.2008
GR25.12.2008
IS24.01.2009
PT24.02.2009
Former [2010/25]AT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
CZ24.09.2008
DK24.09.2008
EE24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
IT24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
NL24.09.2008
PL24.09.2008
RO24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
SK24.09.2008
BG24.12.2008
SE24.12.2008
IS24.01.2009
PT24.02.2009
Former [2010/13]AT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
CZ24.09.2008
DK24.09.2008
EE24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
IT24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
NL24.09.2008
RO24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
SK24.09.2008
BG24.12.2008
SE24.12.2008
IS24.01.2009
PT24.02.2009
Former [2010/01]AT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
CZ24.09.2008
DK24.09.2008
EE24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
IT24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
NL24.09.2008
RO24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
SK24.09.2008
BG24.12.2008
IS24.01.2009
PT24.02.2009
Former [2009/28]AT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
CZ24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
NL24.09.2008
RO24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
SK24.09.2008
BG24.12.2008
IS24.01.2009
PT24.02.2009
Former [2009/19]AT24.09.2008
BE24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
Former [2009/15]AT24.09.2008
FI24.09.2008
LT24.09.2008
LV24.09.2008
SI24.09.2008
Former [2009/10]LT24.09.2008
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2005029807  (IBM [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12-16 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 3, line 21 - page 7, line 1 * * page 9, lines 1-20 * * page 15, lines 13-30 * * claim 6 * [Y] 5-11,17-22;
 [A]EP1641215  (LAYER 7 TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [A] 8,9,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0110] , [0148] *
 [Y]  CHINNICI R; ET AL, "Web Services Description Language (WSDL) Version 2.0 Part 1: Core Language", W3C CANDIDATE RECOMENDATION, (20060327), pages 1 - 135, URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/2006/CR-wsdl20-20060327/wsdl20.pdf, (20070110), XP002414179 [Y] 5-11,17-22 * Section 1.1: Web Service Section 2.8: Property Section 2.9: Binding Section 2.14: Service Section 2.15: Endpoint *