blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1840872

EP1840872 - Speech synthesizer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsumoto, Chikako c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06016106.402.08.2006
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateJP2006009733131.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006097331
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1840872
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1840872
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2006
ClassificationIPC:G10L13/08
[2007/40]
CPC:
G10L13/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/24]
Former [2007/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sprachsynthesizer[2007/40]
English:Speech synthesizer[2007/40]
French:Synthétiseur de parole[2007/40]
Examination procedure04.05.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/11]
03.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2008Fee for grant paid
29.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.06.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0427485  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 11* the whole document *;
 [Y]US2005171778  (SASAKI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,7-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0130] *;
 [XY]US2005261905  (PYO KYOUNGNAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] - [0037] - [0040] * [Y] 5,7-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.