Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1717262

EP1717262 - Process aid for melt processable polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.03.2009
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
[2016/15]
Former [2016/14]For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Former [2008/42]For all designated states
DuPont Performance Elastomers L.L.C.
300 Bellevue Parkway
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
Former [2006/44]For all designated states
DUPONT DOW ELASTOMERS L.L.C.
Bellevue Park Corporate Center, 300 Bellevue Parkway
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chapman, George, Richard, jr.
224 Wrights Lane
Media, PA 19063 / US
02 / Oriani, Steven, Richard
430 Buttonwood Road
Landenberg, PA 19350 / US
 [2006/44]
Representative(s)Heinemann, Monica , et al
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/44]Heinemann, Monica , et al
Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Poschingerstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06016201.312.02.2002
[2006/44]
Priority number, dateUS20010269247P16.02.2001         Original published format: US 269247 P
US2001095363817.09.2001         Original published format: US 953638
[2006/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1717262
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1717262
Date:08.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/00, C08L23/04
[2006/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/44]
TitleGerman:Verarbeitungshilfsmittel für schmelzverarbeitbare Polymere[2006/44]
English:Process aid for melt processable polymers[2006/44]
French:Adjuvant de traitement pour polymères pouvant être traités à l'état fondu[2006/44]
Examination procedure07.03.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/16]
27.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2009Fee for grant paid
06.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02724996.0  / EP1366108
Divisional application(s)EP09156699.2  / EP2070972
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2010  19.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al
Mathys & Squire
Maximilianstraße 35 Eingang A
80539 München / DE
 [2019/34]
Former [2015/25]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2010  19.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/11]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2010  19.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner
Patentanwälte
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/10]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2010  19.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Kurz, Arnd, et al
3M Deutschland GmbH
3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [2010/07]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2010   
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Kurz, Arnd, et al
3M ESPE AG 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
12.02.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.08.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.09.2013Reply to a communication from the opposition division
25.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1979/15
26.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
05.12.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
24.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
03.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
03.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US5830947  (BLONG THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9945065  (DYNEON LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,8-11 * claim - *;
 [X]GB2343896  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [X] 2,4,5 * page 3, lines 9-23 * * page 5, paragraph 3 *
by applicantUS4855360
 US5587429
 US5707569
 US3125547
 US5010130
 US6048939