Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1759961

EP1759961 - Vehicle front end with upper and lower cross beams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HBPO GmbH
Rixbecker Strasse 75
59775 Lippstadt / DE
[2007/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Schlüter, Sascha, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Polder 13
26842 Ostrhauderfehn / DE
 [2007/10]
Representative(s)Schober, Mirko , et al
Thielking & Elbertzhagen
Patentanwälte
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/10]Schober, Mirko , et al
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2007/10]Elbertzhagen, Otto , et al
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date06017705.225.08.2006
[2007/10]
Priority number, dateDE2005104175702.09.2005         Original published format: DE102005041757
[2007/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1759961
Date:07.03.2007
Language:DE
[2007/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1759961
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/08
[2007/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/10]
TitleGerman:Fahrzeug-Frontend mit oberem und unterem Querträger[2007/10]
English:Vehicle front end with upper and lower cross beams[2007/10]
French:Face avant de véhicule automobile comprenant une traverse supérieure et une traverse inférieure[2007/10]
Examination procedure06.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
07.09.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2008Fee for grant paid
30.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
AT25.08.2009
LU25.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
BE31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
AT25.08.2009
LU25.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
BE31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
AT25.08.2009
LU25.08.2009
BE31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2011/02]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
AT25.08.2009
BE31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/31]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
BE31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/16]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
Former [2010/13]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/01]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[DXY]DE19911833  (AUDI AG [DE]) [DX] 1 * column 2, line 51 - line 59 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]US4566407  (PETER DIETMAR [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO2004056619  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0024] * * figure 1 *;
 [PX]EP1645451  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * figure 2 *;
 [E]EP1698520  (HBPO GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2004144522  (BAUER RALPH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [X]FR2862262  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US2001001994  (ENOMOTO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * page 2 *;
 [XA]US2004084236  (OKAI HARUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 12 * [A] 3;
 [X]DE10337870  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2005070747  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 4 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *