Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1898160

EP1898160 - Method for controlling a heating system and heating system for carying out said method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krüger, Walter
An der Passade 5
32657 Lemgo / DE
[2011/16]
Former [2008/11]For all designated states
Wendler, Uwe
An der Passade 4
32657 Lemgo / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wendler, Uwe
An der Passade 4
32657 Lemgo / DE
02 / Gröning, Andreas
Gartenstrasse 21
32825 Blomberg / DE
03 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
 [2008/11]
Representative(s)Niestroy, Manfred
Patentanwälte
Geyer, Fehners & Partner
Sellierstrasse 1
07745 Jena / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/11]Niestroy, Manfred
Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Sellierstrasse 1
07745 Jena / DE
Application number, filing date06018062.730.08.2006
[2008/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1898160
Date:12.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1898160
Date:09.02.2011
Language:DE
[2011/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:F24D19/10, F24D3/08
[2008/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Regelung einer Heizungsanlage und Heizungsanlage zur Ausübung dieses Verfahrens[2008/11]
English:Method for controlling a heating system and heating system for carying out said method[2008/11]
French:Procédé de regulation d'une installation de chauffage et installation de chauffage permettant le mettre en oeuvre[2008/11]
Examination procedure01.02.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2007Examination requested  [2008/11]
06.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2010Fee for grant paid
24.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
GR09.02.2011
HU09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
TR09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
AT30.08.2011
GB30.08.2011
LU30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
[2014/38]
Former [2013/45]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
HU09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
TR09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
AT30.08.2011
GB30.08.2011
LU30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/44]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
TR09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
AT30.08.2011
GB30.08.2011
LU30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/33]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IS09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
AT30.08.2011
GB30.08.2011
LU30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/25]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
AT30.08.2011
GB30.08.2011
LU30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2013/07]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
AT30.08.2011
GB30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/37]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
GB30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/36]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
GB30.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/25]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
BE31.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/24]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
CH31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/20]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
CH31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/18]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/47]CY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IE09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/39]CY09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
NL09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT09.02.2011
LV09.02.2011
PL09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]AT400629B  (VAILLANT GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,3-5,7-10,14,19 * figure 1 * [Y] 2,6,11,12,15-18;
 [XY]EP0675326  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10,14,19 * column 6; figure 1 * [Y] 11,12;
 [DY]DE19627271  (HUSTEDT JOHANN [DE]) [DY] 15 * abstract *;
 [DY]DE10033669  (SCHMIDT WALTER [DE]) [DY] 16,17 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE4429215  (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [Y] 2,18 * column 2 *;
 [X]AT7954U  (LOGOTHERM REGELSYSTEME GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,3-5,7-12,14,16,17,19 * the whole document *;
 [XY]DE10352984  (BBT THERMOTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,10 * page 1 - page 2 * [Y] 6;
 [A]GB2183068  (MICRO DESIGN ASSOCIATES LIMITE) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE29801084U  (SCHMIDT WALTER [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *