Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1764770

EP1764770 - Display device and driving method of display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.
398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/12]For all designated states
SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD.
398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shishido, Hideaki
Semiconductor Energy Laboraty Co., Ltd. 398, Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
 [2007/12]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06018355.501.09.2006
[2007/12]
Priority number, dateJP2005026965416.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005269654
[2007/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1764770
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1764770
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/32
[2007/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL [2012/47]
Former [2007/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung und Ansteuerverfahren für eine Anzeigevorrichtung[2007/12]
English:Display device and driving method of display device[2007/12]
French:Dispositif d'affichage et procédé de commande du dispositif d'affichage[2007/12]
Examination procedure10.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
15.09.2012Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.10.2012Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/36]
30.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201712   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1465143  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1517290  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * figures 9,10 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 57] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]US2004196224  (KWON OH-KYONG [KR]) [A] 1-18 * figures 5-8 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0 29] - [0055] *;
 [A]US2005122283  (KIMURA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 1A-2B * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0059] *;
 [A]US2005052366  (KIM KEUM-NAM [KR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004070557  (ASANO MITSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1465143