EP1767811 - Shock absorber with a damping force depending on the amplitude [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, ES, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammer, Thomas Rosenstrasse 2 97653 Bischofsheim / DE | 02 /
Doppermas, Michael Ellernweg 4 96170 Priesendorf / DE | 03 /
Denner, Manfred Thundorfer Strasse 12 97711 Massbach / DE | 04 /
Planitzer, Matthias Schleifweg 20 97520 Röthlein / DE | [2007/13] | Application number, filing date | 06018428.0 | 04.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | DE20051045267 | 22.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005045267 | [2007/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1767811 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767811 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/512, F16F9/34 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
F16F9/341 (EP,US);
F16F9/512 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfer mit amplitudenselektiver Dämpfkraft | [2007/13] | English: | Shock absorber with a damping force depending on the amplitude | [2007/13] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations avec une force d'amortissement dépendant de l'amplitude | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IE | 11.02.2009 | IT | 11.02.2009 | LT | 11.02.2009 | LV | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | PL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | IS | 11.06.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | HU | 12.08.2009 | AT | 04.09.2009 | LU | 04.09.2009 | ES | 05.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
AT | 04.09.2009 | ||
LU | 04.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 04.09.2009 | ||
LU | 04.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 04.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 04.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04102737 (TOKICO LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]DE19948328 (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE INC [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19749356 (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE INC [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract * |