blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1898551 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1898551



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1061
09.02.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.01.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 29
25.01.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Opposition 29
25.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.10.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
05.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.08.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
18.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.07.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
31.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 13
24.05.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 38
18.08.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
18.08.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
04.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 26
01.12.2014 Claims Appeal 26
01.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.12.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
01.12.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 64
07.08.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.08.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 23
25.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
13.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.06.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.06.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
15.04.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
07.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
02.04.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
02.04.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
02.04.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
11.02.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
11.02.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 13
18.12.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
18.12.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
18.12.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
11.12.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
10.12.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
18.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
13.08.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.08.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
05.02.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 1
05.02.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 1
12.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
12.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 7
12.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 6
11.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
11.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.01.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.09.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
10.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.05.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
22.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
22.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
22.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
22.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
22.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
22.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.04.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
22.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
22.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
22.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
22.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
22.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
22.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
22.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
22.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
21.04.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
21.04.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
21.04.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
25.06.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.05.2009 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.05.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
28.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.02.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.02.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
21.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
21.11.2008 Description Search / examination 6
21.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
30.09.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.03.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.02.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.01.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.01.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.01.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
05.09.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
05.09.2006 Description Search / examination 11
05.09.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2006 Drawings Search / examination 1
05.09.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6