Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1763258

EP1763258 - Medical stereo observation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi
Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
[2016/40]
Former [2015/51]For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Former [2007/11]For all designated states
OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirose, Kenji c/o I. P. S. Dept., Olympus
I. P. Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP
02 / Ishikawa, Tomonori c/o I. P. S. Dept., Olympus
I. P. Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP
03 / Morita, Kazuo c/o I. P. S. Dept., Olympus
I. P. Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP
 [2007/11]
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/11]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date06018707.706.09.2006
[2007/11]
Priority number, dateJP2005026167009.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005261670
JP2005026680814.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005266808
[2007/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1763258
Date:14.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1763258
Date:23.05.2007
[2007/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1763258
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00, G02B21/22
[2007/11]
Designated contracting statesDE [2008/05]
Former [2007/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Medizinisches Stereo-Beobachtungssystem[2007/11]
English:Medical stereo observation system[2007/11]
French:Système d'observation stéréo médical[2007/11]
Examination procedure06.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2007Examination requested  [2007/51]
21.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2010Fee for grant paid
23.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.08.2011  06.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Diehl & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Strasse 9
80636 München / DE
 [2013/37]
Former [2011/37]
Opponent(s)01  03.08.2011   
Carl Zeiss AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schorr, Frank Jürgen
Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
08.09.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.03.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.04.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition06.06.2014Appeal received No.  T1313/14
19.08.2014Statement of grounds filed
16.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DX]JPH08313828  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [DX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0642275  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 37 - line 42; figure 4a * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 7; figure 12 * * column 11, line 13 - line 21; figure 17a *;
 [X]EP0827349  (MURAKAMI KANJI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 22 - line 26; figure 7c *;
 [X]US5793523  (TWISSELMANN LORENZ [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003218720  (MORITA KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6313952  (YONEZAWA YASUO [JP]) [A] 4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005174655  (STRAEHLE FRITZ [DE], et al) [A] 4 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0074]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0088]; figure 1 *
by applicantJPH08313828
 EP0642275
 EP0827349
 US5793523
 JPH08201940
 JP2003233031
 JPH0937302