EP1724658 - Structured document signature device, structured document adaptation device and structured document verification device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimoto, Hiroshi c/o IPD, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Takashi c/o IPD, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakayama, Takehiro c/o IPD, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takeshita, Atsushi c/o IPD, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06018853.9 | 17.09.2004 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | JP20030329175 | 19.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003329175 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724658 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724658 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US);
H04L2209/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/47] | Title | German: | Unterschriftsvorrichtung, Anpassungsvorrichtung und Verifikationsvorrichtung für ein strukturiertes Dokument | [2006/47] | English: | Structured document signature device, structured document adaptation device and structured document verification device | [2006/47] | French: | Dispositif de signature numérique d'un document structuré, dispositif d'adaptation d'un document structuré et dispositif de vérification d'un document structuré | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04022174.9 / EP1517214 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0111843 (SUDIA FRANK W [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 5 - page 66 *; | [X]WO0103363 (TIME CERTAIN LLC [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001021928 (LUDWIG HEIKO H [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0120]; figures 3-15 *; | [A]US6097811 (MICALI SILVIO [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5995625 (SUDIA FRANK W [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |