Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1898345

EP1898345 - System for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/11]Method and system for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture
[2010/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2011/03]
Former [2008/11]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hafermann, Dr. Udo
Spitzwegpfad 5
64291 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Post, Dr. Ulrich
Tannenbergstrasse 34
64342 Seeheim / DE
03 / Schöning, Dr. Harald
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
 [2008/11]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/11]Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06018965.111.09.2006
[2008/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1898345
Date:12.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1898345
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2008/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/11]
TitleGerman:System zur Verwaltung des Lebenszyklus einer dienstorientierten Architektur[2010/30]
English:System for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture[2010/30]
French:Système de gestion du cycle de vie d'une architecture orientée service[2010/30]
Former [2008/11]Verfahren und System zur Verwaltung des Lebenszyklus einer dienstorientierten Architektur
Former [2008/11]Method and system for managing the lifecycle of a service oriented architecture
Former [2008/11]Procédé et système de gestion du cycle de vie d'une architecture orientée service
Examination procedure21.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/14]
29.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2010Date of oral proceedings
02.07.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2010Fee for grant paid
29.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10194563.2  / EP2293230
Opposition(s)20.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
HU19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
TR19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
IE11.09.2011
LU11.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
FR30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
TR19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
IE11.09.2011
LU11.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
FR30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2013/25]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
IE11.09.2011
LU11.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
FR30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/37]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
IE11.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
FR30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/35]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
IE11.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/33]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/20]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/03]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
IT19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/50]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
CZ19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
RO19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
SK19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/47]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
DK19.01.2011
EE19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/39]AT19.01.2011
BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
NL19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/37]BE19.01.2011
CY19.01.2011
FI19.01.2011
LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
SI19.01.2011
BG19.04.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT19.01.2011
LV19.01.2011
PL19.01.2011
SE19.01.2011
GR20.04.2011
ES30.04.2011
IS19.05.2011
PT19.05.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]  TOPOLNIK M ET AL, Implementation of the ebxml registry client for the ebxml registry services, TELECOMMUNICATIONS, 2003. CONTEL 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON JUNE 11-13, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 551-556, ISBN 953-184-052-0, XP010646949 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  FARRUKH NAJMI, Web Content Management Using the OASIS ebXML Registry Standard, XP002412451 [X] 1-15 * section "Features of ebXML Registry" *
 [X]  ANONYMOUS, About the OSGi Service Platform - Technical Whitepaper - Rev. 3.0, XP002367057 [X] 1-15 * Section "Key Features of the OSGi Service Platform" *
 [A]  DOGAC ET AL, "Artemis: Deploying semantically enriched Web services in the healthcare domain", INFORMATION SYSTEMS, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200606), vol. 31, no. 4-5, ISSN 0306-4379, pages 321 - 339, XP005309407 [A] 3 * Section 2.7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.is.2005.02.006
 [A]  ANONYMOUS, "Web Services Made Easier, The Java APIs and Architectures for XML", INTERNET CITATION, (20011031), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20011116112311/http://java.sun.com/xml/web services.pdf, (20041124), XP002307219 [A] 11 * pages 19-21 *
 [A]  THOMPSON S M, "CONFIGURATION MANAGEMENT - KEEPING IT ALL TOGETHER", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (199707), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 1358-3948, pages 48 - 60, XP000722017 [A] 1-15 * Section 5.4 and 5.5 * * figure 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018682001890