EP1728587 - Machine tool with a device for detecting vibration on its rotary table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamazaki Mazak Corporation 1 Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun Aichi pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORPORATION 1 Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun Aichi pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichino, Kentaro c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corp. 1, Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun, Aichi pref. / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Tohru c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corp. 1, Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun, Aichi pref. / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Yasuhiko c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corp. 1, Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun, Aichi pref. / JP | 04 /
Okada, Satoshi c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corp. 1, Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun, Aichi pref. / JP | 05 /
Kurata, Masahiro c/o Yamazaki Mazak Corp. 1, Norifune, Oguchi-cho Niwa gun, Aichi pref. / JP | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstraße 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019084.0 | 25.07.2005 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | JP20040217615 | 26.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004217615 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1728587 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1728587 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, F16F15/32, G01M1/38 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
F16F15/22 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0035 (EP,US);
G01M1/16 (EP,US);
G01M1/32 (EP,US);
B23Q2220/004 (EP,US);
Y10T408/76 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303752 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304312 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30476 (EP,US);
Y10T409/305656 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307672 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307728 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2109 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/33] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine mit einer Vorrichtung zur Detektion von Schwingungen ihres Drehtischs | [2006/49] | English: | Machine tool with a device for detecting vibration on its rotary table | [2006/49] | French: | Machine outil avec appareil pour détecter une vibration de son plateau tournant | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 09.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05016091.0 / EP1621285 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2002028858 ; | [A]GB922217 (BIRFIELD ENG LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5992232 (SAITOH NOBORU [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 39; figures 1A-6,28; claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO0073018 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,10 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002028858 A 20020129 (TOYODA MACH WORKS LTD) [AD] 1-3 * abstract * |