Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1902629

EP1902629 - Apparatus for producing a confectionery product from multiple components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/13]Method and apparatus for producing a confectionery product from multiple components
[2015/09]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.05.2015
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kraft Foods R & D, Inc.
Three Parkway North
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
[2014/29]
Former [2008/44]For all designated states
Kraft Foods R & D, Inc.
Three Lakes Drive
Northfield, IL 60093 / US
Former [2008/13]For all designated states
Kraft Foods R & D, Inc. Zweigniederlassung München
Bayerwaldstrasse 8
81737 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Abylov, Melis
Rosenheimerstrasse 30/App. 407
81669 München / DE
02 / Hecht, Gerhard
Suedlachenbuehl 7
87600 Kaufbeuren / DE
03 / Kijowski, Mark
Tal 39
80331 München / DE
04 / Simbuerger, Stephan
Wuermtalstrasse 140
81375 München / DE
 [2008/13]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/25]
Former [2008/13]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06019675.520.09.2006
[2008/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1902629
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1902629
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1902629
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:A23G1/00, A23G1/20
[2008/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2008/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für die Herstellung einer Süßware aus einer Vielzahl von Zutaten[2015/09]
English:Apparatus for producing a confectionery product from multiple components[2015/09]
French:Dispositif pour la production d'une confiserie de multiples composants[2015/09]
Former [2008/13]Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Herstellung einer Süssware aus einer Vielzahl von Zutaten
Former [2008/13]Method and apparatus for producing a confectionery product from multiple components
Former [2008/13]Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'une confisérie de multiples composants
Examination procedure18.05.2007Examination requested  [2008/13]
22.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2008Fee for grant paid
15.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009  02.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
NESTEC S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/01]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2009   
NESTEC S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
07.01.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.04.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.06.2012Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.07.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
14.10.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.10.2014Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.02.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.05.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition11.09.2012Appeal received No.  T2066/12
23.11.2012Statement of grounds filed
14.10.2014Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
14.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
LT20.09.2011
RO20.09.2011
TR20.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
[2017/40]
Former [2016/36]AT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
LT20.09.2011
RO20.09.2011
TR20.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
Former [2016/35]AT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
LT20.09.2011
RO20.09.2011
TR20.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
Former [2016/12]AT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
LT20.09.2011
RO20.09.2011
TR20.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
Former [2015/49]CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
LT20.09.2011
RO20.09.2011
TR20.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
Former [2013/47]CY25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
GR04.04.2011
LT20.09.2011
RO20.09.2011
TR20.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
Former [2011/36]EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
GR04.04.2011
Former [2011/22]EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
LU20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/40]EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
IE20.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/20]EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/01]EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US4664927  (FINKEL GILBERT [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 9; example 4; claims 1,2,5,6,11 *;
 [A]WO0195737  (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,8 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 3 * * page 7, line 20 - line 25; example - *;
 [DA]EP0832567  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [DA] 1,2,5 * page 3, line 1 - line 35; example -; claims 1,3,9 *;
 [A]US5232734  (TAKEMORI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 30 *;
 [A]US5468509  (SCHLUP RAPHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 1; example -; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0958747  (DOVEUROPE S A [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
OppositionWO0032057
 US4191786
 US3830407