Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1767910

EP1767910 - Light amount measuring apparatus and light amount measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.09.2012  [2012/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/13]For all designated states
Yokogawa Electric Corporation
9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi
Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Araragi, Muneki
c/o Yokogawa Electric Corp. 9-32 Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
02 / Tanaami, Takeo
c/o Yokogawa Electric Corp. 9-32 Nakacho 2-chome
Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP
 [2007/13]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/13]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06019691.220.09.2006
[2007/13]
Priority number, dateJP2005027950627.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005279506
[2007/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1767910
Date:28.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1767910
Date:17.10.2007
[2007/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01J1/08, G01J1/42
[2007/13]
Designated contracting statesDE [2008/26]
Former [2007/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Messen der Lichtstärke[2007/13]
English:Light amount measuring apparatus and light amount measuring method[2007/13]
French:Appareil et procédé de mesure de la quantité de lumière[2007/13]
Examination procedure10.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/22]
18.04.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
30.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/39]
09.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2002195554  (STATON KENNETH L [US], et al) [X] 2,3,5,6,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] , [0022] - [0024] - [0026] - [0028] - [0031] , [0037] , [0038] * [Y] 1,4,7;
 [Y]US4262205  (ABU-SHUMAYS AHMAD) [Y] 1,4,7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-11 * * column 3, lines 36-48 *;
 [A]US2004113096  (TANAAMI TAKEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0038] *