Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1772469

EP1772469 - Polymer and film forming composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Katsuyuki
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP
02 / Hiraoka, Hidetoshi
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP
 [2007/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/15]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06020275.127.09.2006
[2007/15]
Priority number, dateJP2005028171028.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005281710
JP2005035671509.12.2005         Original published format: JP 2005356715
[2007/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1772469
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1772469
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C08F38/00, C08J5/18, C09D4/00
[2009/09]
Former International [2007/15]C08F38/00, C08J5/18
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/44]
Former [2007/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Polymer und filmbildende Zusammensetzung[2007/15]
English:Polymer and film forming composition[2007/15]
French:Polymère et composition filmogène[2007/15]
Examination procedure26.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/07]
02.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP1605016  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 3-11 * the whole document *;
 [DXY]US5017734  (BAUM KURT [US], et al) [DX] 3-5,7,8,10 * examples 6-8 * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 5, line 11 - line 13 * * column 1, line 26 - line 31 * [Y] 6;
 [XY]US6858700  (DAHL JEREMY E [US], et al) [X] 3,5,9,11 * column 25, line 32 - line 49; figures 2B-2E; table 2 * * column 30, line 62 * * column 30, line 53 - line 54 * [Y] 6