Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1772785

EP1772785 - Production monitoring and control system having organizational structure-based presentation layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.08.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc.
1 Allen-Bradley Drive
Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US
[2007/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Gordon, Kevin G.
802 Carleton Court Annacis Island Delta
British Columbia Canada V3M 6Y6 / CA
02 / Bromley, Clifton H.
Suite 1901, 8 Laguna Court New Westminster
British Columbia Canada V3M 6M6 / CA
03 / Dorgelo, Eric G.
Apt 13-65 Foxwood Drive Port Moody
British Columbia Canada V3H 4Z5 / CA
04 / Reichard, Douglas J.
4177 West 224th St.
Fairview Ohio 44126 / US
05 / Semkow, Marc D.
5358 Moreland Drive Burnaby
British Columbia Canada V5G 1Z8 / CA
06 / Virji, Shafin A.
447 East 50th Avenue Vancouver
British Columbia Canada V5X 1A9 / CA
 [2007/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2007/30]Englaender, Klaus , et al
HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3
80799 München / DE
Former [2007/15]Jung HML
Schraudolphstrasse 3
80799 München / DE
Application number, filing date06020458.328.09.2006
[2007/15]
Priority number, dateUS2005023992530.09.2005         Original published format: US 239925
[2007/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1772785
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1772785
Date:16.12.2009
[2009/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042
[2007/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/34]
Former [2007/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Produktionsüberwachungs- und -steuersystem mit einer auf einer Organisationsstruktur basierenden Präsentationsschicht[2007/15]
English:Production monitoring and control system having organizational structure-based presentation layer[2007/15]
French:Système de surveillance et de contrôle de la production avec une couche presentation basé sur la structure d'une organisation[2007/15]
Examination procedure10.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/29]
17.06.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
26.07.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination01.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1648/16
02.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6477434  (WEWALAARACHCHI BANDU [SG] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * column 3, line 28 - line 34 * * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 13 * * column 9, line 65 - column 15, line 65 * [Y] 5,7;
 [XY]GB2407243  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 2, line 7 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 3 * * page 7, line 23 - page 10, line 20 * * page 16, line 4 - page 18, line 26 * [Y] 5,7;
 [Y]WO0070417  (FOXBORO CO [US]) [Y] 5,7 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 28, line 1 - page 29, line 1 *