Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1908476

EP1908476 - Galectin-2 for the treatment of inflammatory diseases of the skin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2010  [2010/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin
Schumannstrasse 20/21
10117 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Universitätsklinikum Münster
Domagkstrasse 5
48149 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]For all designated states
Charité-Universitätsmedizin Berlin
Schumannstrasse 20/21
10117 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Universitätsklinikum Münster
Domagkstrasse 5
48149 Münster / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sturm, Andreas
Huntestrasse 3a
14167 Berlin / DE
02 / Dignass, Axel
Im Braungeröll 11
60431 Frankfurt/Main / DE
03 / Loser, Karin
Franziskanerinnenweg 16
48341 Altenberge / DE
04 / Beissert, Stefan
Breul 28
48143 Münster / DE
 [2008/15]
Representative(s)Engelhard, Markus
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/15]Engelhard, Markus
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date06020467.428.09.2006
[2008/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1908476
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61K39/395, A61K31/436, A61P17/06
[2009/33]
Former International [2008/15]A61K38/17, A61P17/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/15]
TitleGerman:Galectin-2 zur Behandlung von Hautentzündungskrankheiten[2008/15]
English:Galectin-2 for the treatment of inflammatory diseases of the skin[2008/15]
French:Galectine-2 pour le traitement de maladies inflammatoires de la peau[2008/15]
Examination procedure02.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/46]
30.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/23]
20.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005092368  (CHARITE UNI SMEDIZIN BERLIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 9; claims 4,8-15 *;
 [X]EP1593386  (CHARITE UNIVERSITAETSMEDIZIN [DE]) [X] 1-17 * claims 4,9-20 *;
 [A]  LIU F-T, "GALECTINS: A NEW FAMILY OF REGULATORS OF INFLAMMATION", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,, US, (200011), vol. 97, no. 2, ISSN 1521-6616, pages 79 - 88, XP001182659 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/clim.2000.4912
 [A]  RABINOVICH G A ET AL, "Role of galectins in inflammatory and immunomodulatory processes", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20020919), vol. 1572, no. 2-3, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 274 - 284, XP004380522 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(02)00314-8