Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1777048 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 461
13.09.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.09.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
01.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.08.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
19.08.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
09.07.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.07.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.07.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
30.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
27.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
27.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.05.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.02.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 8
12.02.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.02.2014 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
03.05.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
31.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.01.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
13.01.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
13.01.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
13.01.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.09.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
06.09.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.07.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.07.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.06.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
27.06.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.06.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.06.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.04.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.04.2011 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
28.04.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
28.04.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.03.2011 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2010 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent Opposition 1
02.12.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.11.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.11.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.09.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 18
29.09.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
29.09.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
29.09.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
29.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
29.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
29.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.12.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.11.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.11.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.07.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.07.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.07.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.07.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
27.05.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
27.05.2008 Description Search / examination 4
27.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
25.03.2008 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
17.03.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.03.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.03.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.03.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.2007 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 4
21.11.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.05.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.03.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.02.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.02.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 2
01.02.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
17.11.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.11.2006 Priority document Search / examination 31
08.11.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Annex Search / examination 10
08.11.2006 Annex Search / examination 4
08.11.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
07.11.2006 Description Search / examination 10
07.11.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.10.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.10.2006 Drawings Search / examination 6
19.10.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
19.10.2006 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 15
17.10.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Drawings Search / examination 6
17.10.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
17.10.2006 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 15