Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1746434 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1746434



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 93
14.10.2009 Closing of application Search / examination 1
30.06.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
14.01.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.12.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.08.2008 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.07.2008 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.06.2008 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 10
05.06.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
29.12.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.12.2006 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
08.11.2006 Description Search / examination 18
08.11.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 Drawings Search / examination 4
08.11.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
08.11.2006 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6
21.10.2002 Priority document Search / examination 33