blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1746434

EP1746434 - Three dimensional object locator system using a sound beacon, and corresponding method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, Inc.
One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
One Symbol Plaza Holtsville
New York 11742-1300 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Willins, Bruce A.
11 Findley Drive
East Northport, NY 11731 / US
02 / Goren, David
54 Steven Place
Smithtown, NY 11787 / US
03 / Volkommer, Richard M.
316 Devon Lane
Smithtown, NY 11787 / US
 [2007/04]
Representative(s)Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/04]Emde, Eric
Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06023251.925.09.2002
[2007/04]
Priority number, dateUS2001096137325.09.2001         Original published format: US 961373
[2007/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1746434
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1746434
Date:09.07.2008
[2008/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2008
ClassificationIPC:G01S5/06, H04R5/033
[2007/04]
CPC:
G01S5/06 (EP,US); G01S5/0284 (EP,US); H04R5/033 (EP,US);
H04S7/304 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2007/04]
TitleGerman:Dreidimensionales Objektpositionsbestimmungssystem mit einer akustischen Bake, und entsprechendes Verfahren[2007/04]
English:Three dimensional object locator system using a sound beacon, and corresponding method[2007/04]
French:Système de localisation d'un objet en trois dimensions avec une balise acoustique, et methode correspondante[2007/04]
Examination procedure08.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/04]
14.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/47]
30.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/47]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02021741.0  / EP1296155
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5394332  (KUWAHARA SHINGO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6069585  (LANCIAUX JACQUES [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0062089  (AMAN JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6243476  (GARDNER WILLIAM G [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, lines 28-57 ** claims 12,17 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.