Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1826992

EP1826992 - Multi-communication pathway addressing in a mobile communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.09.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
5300 California Avenue
Irvine, CA 92617 / US
[2007/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Karaoguz, Jeyhan
15 Petria
92606 Irvine CA / US
 [2007/35]
Representative(s)Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstraße 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2007/35]Jehle, Volker Armin
Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date06024205.422.11.2006
[2007/35]
Priority number, dateUS20060776650P24.02.2006         Original published format: US 776650 P
US2006041915318.05.2006         Original published format: US 419153
[2007/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1826992
Date:29.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1826992
Date:26.08.2009
[2009/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725
[2007/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/18]
Former [2007/35]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mehrfach-Kommunikationspfadadressierung in einer tragbaren Kommunikationsvorrichtung[2007/35]
English:Multi-communication pathway addressing in a mobile communication device[2007/35]
French:Adressage de chemin multi-communication dans un dispositif de communication mobile[2007/35]
Examination procedure26.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
27.02.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.04.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
22.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
30.06.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.08.2015Appeal received No.  T2219/15
05.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201611   M06   Not yet paid
30.11.201712   M06   Not yet paid
30.11.201813   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004030391  (AXESSTEL INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 5, line 32 - line 33 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 28 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]EP1241905  (SIEMENS INF & COMM MOBILE LLC [US]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] *;
 [X]EP1517575  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0043] * * claim 4 *;
 [A]GB2333423  (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 2 *