Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1816057

EP1816057 - Post system for commercial vehicle superstructures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Opposition withdrawnpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. HESTERBERG & SÖHNE GmbH & Co. KG
Heilenbecker Strasse 50-60
58256 Ennepetal / DE
[2007/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Tiedtke, Henning
Bergstrasse 28
58256 Ennepetal / DE
02 / Klein, Claus-Jürgen
Lohtringer Strasse 5
58332 Schwelm / DE
 [2007/32]
Representative(s)Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Homberger Strasse 5
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/12]Christophersen, Ulrich Rudolf , et al
Christophersen & Partner
Patentanwälte
Homberger Strasse 5
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/42]Christophersen, Ulrich Rudolf , et al
Christophersen & Partner Patentanwälte Feldstrasse 73
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/32]Döpp, Ludger
Rechtsanwälte Spannagel & Döpp Schulstrasse 52
58332 Schwelm / DE
Application number, filing date06025165.906.12.2006
[2007/32]
Priority number, dateDE2006100499401.02.2006         Original published format: DE102006004994
[2007/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1816057
Date:08.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1816057
Date:23.07.2008
[2008/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1816057
Date:19.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:B62D33/02
[2007/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/32]
TitleGerman:Rungensystem für Nutzfahrzeugaufbauten[2007/32]
English:Post system for commercial vehicle superstructures[2007/32]
French:Système de montants pour véhicules utilitaires[2007/32]
Examination procedure03.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2008Examination requested  [2008/51]
13.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2014Fee for grant paid
10.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  WITHDRAWN
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 02  14.11.2014  20.11.2014  WITHDRAWN
ADAICO, S.L.
Avda. Zaragoza, 91
31006 Pamplona Navarra / ES
Opponent's representative
Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 03  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1
89349 Burtenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Kilchert, Jochen
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
 04  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Nevpa Europe GmbH
Am Drostenstück 31a
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 07 68
58007 Hagen / DE
 06  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Trailer Systems GmbH
Im Moerser Feld 1f
47441 Moers / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al
Bonnekamp & Sparing
Patentanwaltskanzlei
European Patent and Trademark Law Firm
Malkastenstrasse 7
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/44]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  WITHDRAWN
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 02  14.11.2014  20.11.2014  WITHDRAWN
ADAICO, S.L.
Avda. Zaragoza, 91
31006 Pamplona Navarra / ES
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 03  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1
89349 Burtenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Kilchert, Jochen
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
 04  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Nevpa Europe GmbH
Am Drostenstück 31a
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 07 68
58007 Hagen / DE
 06  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Trailer Systems GmbH
Im Moerser Feld 1f
47441 Moers / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al
Bonnekamp & Sparing
Patentanwaltskanzlei
European Patent and Trademark Law Firm
Malkastenstrasse 7
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2016/44]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  WITHDRAWN
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 02  14.11.2014  20.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ADAICO, S.L.
Avda. Zaragoza, 91
31006 Pamplona Navarra / ES
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 03  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1
89349 Burtenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Kilchert, Jochen
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
 04  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Nevpa Europe GmbH
Am Drostenstück 31a
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 07 68
58007 Hagen / DE
 06  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Trailer Systems GmbH
Im Moerser Feld 1f
47441 Moers / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al
Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei, European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm, Goltsteinstrasse 19
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/31]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  WITHDRAWN
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 02  14.11.2014  20.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ADAICO, S.L.
Avda. Zaragoza, 91
31006 Pamplona Navarra / ES
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 03  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1
89349 Burtenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Kilchert, Jochen
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 04  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Nevpa Europe GmbH
Am Drostenstück 31a
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 07 68
58007 Hagen / DE
 06  19.12.2014  13.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
European Trailer Systems GmbH
Im Moerser Feld 1f
47441 Moers / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al
Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei, European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm, Goltsteinstrasse 19
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/07]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  WITHDRAWN
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 02  14.11.2014  20.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ADAICO, S.L.
Avda. Zaragoza, 91
31006 Pamplona Navarra / ES
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 03  19.12.2014   
Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1
89349 Burtenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Kilchert, Jochen
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 04  19.12.2014   
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  19.12.2014   
Nevpa Europe GmbH
Am Drostenstück 31a
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörner, Martin
Dörner, Kötter & Kollegen Patentanwälte Körnerstraße 27
58095 Hagen / DE
 06  19.12.2014   
European Trailer Systems GmbH
Im Moerser Feld 1f
47441 Moers / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al
Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei, European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm, Goltsteinstrasse 19
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/05]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  WITHDRAWN
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 02  14.11.2014  20.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ADAICO, S.L.
Avda. Zaragoza, 91
31006 Pamplona Navarra / ES
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 03  19.12.2014   
Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1
89349 Burtenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Kilchert, Jochen
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 04  19.12.2014   
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/52]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 02  14.11.2014  20.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ADAICO, S.L.
Avda. Zaragoza, 91
31006 Pamplona Navarra / ES
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2014/44]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2014  25.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Stolmár, Matthias
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
26.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.11.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0117/18
13.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
11.12.2012Appeal received No.  T0476/13
08.02.2013Statement of grounds filed
10.10.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
30.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2006
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
AT06.12.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
AT06.12.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
AT06.12.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/25]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
AT06.12.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE06.12.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/36]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/35]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU06.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/08]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10043296  (SCHMITZ CARGOBULL AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10,13 * paragraphs [0019] - [0028]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]DE4321516  (SCHMITZ ANHAENGER FAHRZEUGBAU [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10,13 * columns 3-4; figures 1,2 *;
 [DX]DE202004014744U  (HESTERBERG & SOEHNE GMBH & CO [DE]) [DX] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027]; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE20301201U  (LORENZ GILLHUBER TRANSPORTE UN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * pages 9-12; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO0034075  (VANDERLOO THEODORUS JEROEN [AU]) [A] 1-13 * pages 8-10; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE19544305  (SCHMITZ ANHAENGER FAHRZEUGBAU [DE]) [A] 1-13 * columns 2-3; figures 3,4 *
by applicantDE29816833U
 DE19842844
 DE202004014744U
 DE20303885U
 DE10043296
 DE4321516