Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1772803

EP1772803 - Method and system for performing distributed server change operations in a transaction-safe manner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.08.2010
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bladelogic, Inc.
100 Crosby Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
[2007/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Kraus, Thomas Martin
7 Westview Road
Natick MA 01760 / US
02 / Manwani, Vijay G.
104 Parker Road
Needham MA 02494 / US
03 / Muddana, Sekhar
46 Trepanier Street
South Attleboro MA 02703 / US
04 / Srinivasa, Balaji
264 Grove Street
Newton MA 02466 / US
05 / Reddy, Ravi
11 Seaver Farm Lane
S. Grafton MA 01560 / US
 [2007/15]
Representative(s)Zahn, Matthias , et al
Peter Bittner und Partner
Herrenwiesenweg 2
69207 Sandhausen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/45]de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2008/36]Peter, Kenneth William , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2008/31]Ede, Eric , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2007/15]McKechnie, Neil Henry , et al
Kennedys Patent Agency Limited 185 St Vincent Street
Glasgow G2 5QD / GB
Application number, filing date06026527.905.06.2003
[2007/15]
Priority number, dateUS20020388112P12.06.2002         Original published format: US 388112 P
US20030453308P10.03.2003         Original published format: US 453308 P
US2003041495916.04.2003         Original published format: US 414959
US2003041495816.04.2003         Original published format: US 414958
US2003041488716.04.2003         Original published format: US 414887
[2007/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1772803
Date:11.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1772803
Date:18.04.2007
[2007/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/445
[2007/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Durchführen von verteilten Server-Änderungs-Operationen in einer transaktionssicheren Weise[2007/15]
English:Method and system for performing distributed server change operations in a transaction-safe manner[2007/15]
French:Méthode et système pour conduire des opérations distribuées de changement serveur d'une manière transactionnellement sûre[2007/15]
Examination procedure02.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/33]
19.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination29.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2652/16
25.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03760238.0  / EP1573520
Divisional application(s)EP16192226.5  / EP3139541
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030760238) is  05.09.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
04.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
20.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201109   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002010910  (CRUDELE MICHELE [IT], et al) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "Windows Installer Service Overview", INTERNET CITATION, (1999), URL: http://download.microsoft.com/download/f/7/7/f777da84-f82d-4b90-a597- e329e09032b0/WIS-Pro.doc, (20040721), XP002289352 [X] 1-17,19-35,37,38 * the whole document *
 [X]  - "DESIGNS FOR UNCOMMITTING AN INSTALL PLAN OBJECT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19950701), vol. 38, no. 7, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 227 - 229, XP000521671 [X] 1,20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BAILEY E C, "Maximum RPM - Taking the Red Hat Package Manager to the Limit", INTERNET CITATION, (199806), URL: http://www.rpm.org/local/maximum-rpm.ps.gz, XP002289333 [A] 1-37 * page 3 - page 7 * * page 15 - page 50 *
 [A]  - HALL R S ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Evaluating software deployment languages and schema: an experience report", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOFTWARE MAINTENANCE. ICSM '98. BETHESDA, MD, NOV. 16 - 20, 1998, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOFTWARE MAINTENANCE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMPUTER SOC, US, (19981116), vol. CONF. 14, ISBN 0-7803-5255-6, pages 177 - 185, XP002235389 [A] 7,8,15,28,29,34 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSM.1998.738507