Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1936494

EP1936494 - Method for runtime execution of one or more tasks defined in a workflow process language [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2012
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
For all designated states
Metaware Societá per Azioni
Via Turati 43-45
56125 Pisa / IT
[2008/46]
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Metaware Societá per Azioni
Via Turati 43-45
56125 Pisa / IT
Former [2008/26]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Tommasi, Alessandro
Via Paolina Bonaparte 133
55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT
02 / Zavattari, Cesare
Via del Santo 103
55020 Diecimo (LU) / IT
03 / Fröhlich, Andreas
Am Trockenbusch 8
64297 Darmstadt / DE
04 / Gesmann, Michael
Bellenweg 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
05 / Schöning, Dr. Harald
Theobaldstr. 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
 [2011/28]
Former [2010/09]01 / Tommasi, Alessandro
Via Paolina Bonaparte 133
55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT
02 / Zavattari, Cesare
Via del Santo 103
55020 Diecimo (LU) / IT
03 / Fröhlich, Andreas
Am Trockenbusch 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
04 / Gesmann, Michael
Bellenweg 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
05 / Schöning, Dr. Harald
Theobaldstr. 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
Former [2008/26]01 / Tommasi, Alessandro
Via Paolina Bonaparte 133
55049 Viareggio (LU) / IT
02 / Zavattari, Cesare
Via del Santo 103
55020 Diecimo (LU) / IT
03 / Fröhlich, Andreas
Am Trockenbusch 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
04 / Gesmann, Michael
Bellenweg 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/26]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06026538.621.12.2006
[2008/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1936494
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1936494
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06Q10/00
[2008/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Ausführung von in einer Prozessbeschreibungssprache definierten Aufgaben[2008/26]
English:Method for runtime execution of one or more tasks defined in a workflow process language[2008/26]
French:Procédé d'exécution des tâches définies dans un langage de processus[2008/26]
Examination procedure09.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/30]
11.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
26.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2011Fee for grant paid
25.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2008
Opposition(s)04.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
08.06.2010Request for further processing filed
08.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HU03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
TR03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
TR03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2013/25]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2013/22]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2013/19]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
FR02.01.2012
Former [2012/49]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/47]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/33]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/23]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/21]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/17]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/08]LT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
IS03.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1643431  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004162741  (FLAXER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]  CHUNG P W H ET AL, "Knowledge-based process management-an approach to handling adaptive workflow", Knowledge-Based Systems Elsevier UK, vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0950-7051, (200304), pages 149 - 160, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0950-7051(02)00080-1, (20070529), XP002435458 [X] 1-12 * sections 4 and 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0950-7051(02)00080-1
 [X]  VIEIRA T A S C ET AL, "An ontology-driven architecture for flexible workflow execution", WEBMEDIA AND LA-WEB, 2004. PROCEEDINGS RIBEIRAO PRETO-SP, BRAZIL 12-15 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041012), ISBN 0-7695-2237-8, pages 70 - 77, XP010734861 [X] 1-12 * sections 3 - 6 *
 [A]  BECO S ET AL, "OWL-WS: A Workflow Ontology for Dynamic Grid Service Composition", E-SCIENCE AND GRID COMPUTING, FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PITTSBURG, PA, USA 05-08 DEC. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051205), ISBN 0-7695-2448-6, pages 148 - 155, XP010874733 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/E-SCIENCE.2005.64
by applicantEP1643431
 US2004162741
    P.W.H. CHUNG ET AL., "Knowledge-based process management - an approach to handling adaptive worliflow", KNOWLEDGE-BASED SYSTEMS ELSEVIER UK, (200304), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 149 - 160,
    T. VIEIRA ET AL., "An ontology-driven architecture for flexible workflow execution", WEBMEDIA AND LA-WEB 2004, PROCEEDINGS, (20041012), pages 70 - 77,
    S. BECO ET AL., "OWL-WS: A Workflow Ontology for Dynamic Grid Service Composition", E-SCIENCE AND GRID COMPUTING, FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (20051205), pages 148 - 155,