Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1936494 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1936494



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 207
06.06.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.06.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.05.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
25.05.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
25.05.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.02.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.02.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.02.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
26.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
26.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
26.01.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.12.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
28.12.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.11.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.06.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
08.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
08.06.2010 Description Search / examination 1
08.06.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
29.03.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
18.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.01.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
21.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
21.11.2008 Description Search / examination 4
21.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
09.10.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
12.09.2008 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
09.09.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
14.08.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
25.07.2008 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
11.07.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.07.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
03.07.2008 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 17
30.06.2008 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
23.06.2008 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
11.06.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.05.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.05.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.04.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 4
14.06.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
22.02.2007 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.12.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
21.12.2006 Description Search / examination 31
21.12.2006 Drawings Search / examination 3
21.12.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6