Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1936494
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8156508Global Dossier 10.04.2012B2
US2008222635 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
EP06026538 21.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1936494Global Dossier 03.08.2011B1
EP1936494 25.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
EP06026538 21.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT519155T 15.08.2011T
Priority number Date
EP06026538 21.12.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN101221637B 23.01.2013B
CN101221637 16.07.2008A
Priority number Date
EP06026538 21.12.2006