Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1834951 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1834951



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 63
03.11.2009 Closing of application Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.11.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
09.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.05.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.2008 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
09.04.2008 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
28.03.2008 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
21.11.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
24.10.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
21.09.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.08.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.01.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.01.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 4
26.01.2007 European search report Search / examination 5
20.11.2006 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.10.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.10.2006 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
10.03.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
10.03.2006 Description Search / examination 6
10.03.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.03.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.03.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6